Cadet et al v. Secretary, Department of Homeland Security, et al
Plaintiff: Djo Miller Cadet and Mina Pierre
Defendant: Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas, USCIS Director Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Secretary, Department of Homeland Security and Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 6:2021cv01940
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed by Mina Pierre, Djo Miller Cadet. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit proof of service)(Stoller, David)
December 16, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Mina Pierre, Djo Miller Cadet. Secretary, Department of Homeland Security served on 11/29/2021, answer due 1/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Summons Executed)(Stoller, David)
December 16, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Mina Pierre, Djo Miller Cadet. Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 11/29/2021, answer due 1/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Summons Executed)(Stoller, David)
November 19, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services and Secretary, Department of Homeland Security. (BD)
November 19, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Order by Djo Miller Cadet, Mina Pierre. (Stoller, David)
November 19, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Djo Miller Cadet, Mina Pierre. Related case(s): Yes (Stoller, David)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 11/19/2021. (GNB) ctp
November 18, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:21-cv-1940-PGB-GJK. (MLJ)
November 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18942080) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Signed Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons, #4 Exhibit Form I-485 Denial, #5 Exhibit Form I-485 Denial, #6 Exhibit I-130 approval, #7 Exhibit I-130 approval, #8 Exhibit parole, #9 Exhibit parole, #10 Exhibit admin order, #11 Exhibit order of removal)(Stoller, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cadet et al v. Secretary, Department of Homeland Security, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Djo Miller Cadet
Represented By: David Stoller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mina Pierre
Represented By: David Stoller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USCIS Director Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary, Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?