Brayton v. Endodontic Associates of Brevard, P.A.
Plaintiff: Susan B. Brayton
Defendant: Endodontic Associates of Brevard, P.A.
Case Number: 6:2021cv02049
Filed: December 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Endodontic Associates of Brevard, P.A..(Russell, Alec)
December 20, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 12/20/2021 by Susan B. Brayton as to Endodontic Associates of Brevard, P.A.. (Storch, Noah)
December 16, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Endodontic Associates of Brevard, P.A. (LDJ)
December 10, 2021 Filing 5 Remark: Doc. #4 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 12/10/2021. (LLM)
December 9, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Susan B. Brayton. (Storch, Noah)
December 9, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Susan B. Brayton. Related case(s): No (Storch, Noah)
December 7, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:21-cv-2049-RBD-GJK. (SJB)
December 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Injunctive and Declaratory Relief Requested against Endodontic Associates of Brevard, P.A. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-19000816) filed by Susan B. Brayton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Storch, Noah) Modified on 12/7/2021 to correct docket text(BD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brayton v. Endodontic Associates of Brevard, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan B. Brayton
Represented By: Noah E. Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endodontic Associates of Brevard, P.A.
Represented By: Alec D. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?