Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 76.26.182.18 and John Doe
Case Number: 6:2021cv02115
Filed: December 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Daniel C Irick
Referring Judge: Gregory A Presnell
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #11 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/18/2022. (RN)
January 13, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference and Incorporated Memorandum of Legal Authority by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Wang, Yetian) Modified text on 1/14/2022 (LDJ).
January 4, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Related case(s): No (Wang, Yetian)
January 4, 2022 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Order by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Wang, Yetian) Modified text on 1/5/2022 (TNP).
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 2/1/2021. (RN)
December 20, 2021 Filing 7 Copyright Report sent to Washington. (TNP)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 12/20/2021. (DS)
December 17, 2021 Filing 5 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Gregory A. Presnell and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:21-cv-2115-GAP-DCI. (SJB)
December 17, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Copyright Report by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wang, Yetian) Modified text on 12/20/2021 (TNP).
December 17, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Related case(s): No (Wang, Yetian)
December 17, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Wang, Yetian)
December 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-19041715) filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wang, Yetian) Modified on 12/20/2021 to correct docket text (BD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Yetian Wang
Represented By: Tyler Mamone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 76.26.182.18
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?