Kidwell v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Kyle Taylor Kidwell
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 6:2022cv00005
Filed: January 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Daniel C Irick
2 Judge: G Kendall Sharp
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2022 Filing 15 Remark: Docs. #7 and #14 have been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 2/8/2022. (LLM)
February 2, 2022 Filing 14 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Kyle Taylor Kidwell. (Attachments: #1 certificate of service)(Saint Charles, Gabrielle)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER to STRIKE Doc. 10 as noncompliant as it does not contain a signature beneath the certification. The Clerk is DIRECTED to remove it from the docket. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to refile a compliant form. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 2/2/2022. (LLM)
February 1, 2022 Filing 12 Case Reassigned to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. New case number: 6:22-cv-00005-RBD-DCI. Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp no longer assigned to the case. (BCW)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER reassigning this case to the Honorable Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr., pursuant to Local Rule 1.07(a)(1), Middle District of Florida, and with his consent, to be considered with Case No. 6:16-cv-2043-RBD-DJK for all further proceedings. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 1/31/2022. (SC)
January 31, 2022 Filing 10 (STRICKEN and REMOVED per Endorsed Order 11) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Kyle Taylor Kidwell. (Attachments: # 1 certificate of service)(Saint Charles, Gabrielle) Modified text on 2/2/2022 (LDJ).
January 31, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Kyle Taylor Kidwell. Related case(s): Yes (Saint Charles, Gabrielle)
January 18, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Commissioner of Social Security. Related case(s): Yes (Rudy, John)
January 18, 2022 Filing 7 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Commissioner of Social Security. (Rudy, John)
January 6, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Nadine Elder on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Elder, Nadine)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER: Parties have 14 days from the date of this Order to file their Disclosure Statement (if not already filed) and, additionally to notify the Court of a related action by filing a Notice of Related Action, Local Rule 1.07(c), that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District of Florida or elsewhere (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 1/4/2022. (counsel emailed)(AKC)
January 4, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (copies mailed/emailed) (AKC)
January 3, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Standing Order on Management of Social Security Cases, 3:21-mc-1-TJC, Doc. #43. (BD)
January 3, 2022 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:22-cv-0005-GKS-DCI. (SJB)
January 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Acting Commissioner of Social Security (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-19078448) filed by Kyle Taylor Kidwell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Saint Charles, Gabrielle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kidwell v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Taylor Kidwell
Represented By: Gabrielle B. Saint Charles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John F. Rudy, III
Represented By: Nadine Elder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?