Brown v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Emma Elisha Brown
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 6:2022cv00006
Filed: January 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Referring Judge: G Kendall Sharp
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Comissioner of Social Security. Related case(s): Yes (Rudy, John)
January 19, 2022 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement re #7 Order by Commissioner of Social Security. (Rudy, John) Modified on 1/19/2022 (SPM).
January 18, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Emma Elisha Brown Related case(s): Yes (Glasser, David) Modified on 1/18/2022 (SPM).
January 18, 2022 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement re #7 Order by Emma Elisha Brown. (Glasser, David) Modified on 1/18/2022 (SPM).
January 6, 2022 Filing 8 (WRONG PDF. CONTACTED COUNSEL TO REFILE) NOTICE of Appearance by Nadine Elder on behalf of Comissioner of Social Security (Elder, Nadine) Modified on 1/6/2022 (SPM).
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER: Parties have 14 days from the date of this Order to file their Disclosure Statement (if not already filed) and, additionally to notify the Court of a related action by filing a Notice of Related Action, Local Rule 1.07(c), that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District of Florida or elsewhere (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 1/5/2022. (counsel emailed)(AKC)
January 5, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (copies mailed/emailed) (AKC)
January 5, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Nadine Elder on behalf of Comissioner of Social Security (Elder, Nadine)
January 4, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsel David W. Glasser of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD)
January 4, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Standing Order on Management of Social Security Cases, 3:21-mc-1-TJC, Doc. #43. (BD)
January 4, 2022 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:22-cv-0006-GKS-GJK. (SJB)
January 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT EMMA BROWN against All Defendants (Filing Fee $402, Receipt # AFLMDC-19078898) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Glasser, David) Modified on 1/4/2022 to correct docket text(SJB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emma Elisha Brown
Represented By: David W. Glasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John F. Rudy, III
Represented By: Nadine Elder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?