Boles v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Alicia M. Boles
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 6:2022cv00377
Filed: February 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2022 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss the Case by Alicia M. Boles. (Fugate, Shea) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
April 1, 2022 Filing 15 Case Reassigned to Judge Wendy W. Berger. New case number: 6:22-cv-377-WWB-GJK. Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp no longer assigned to the case. (NAS)
March 22, 2022 Filing 14 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:22-cv-0377-GKS-GJK. Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick no longer assigned to the case. (SJB)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER directing the Clerk to transfer this case to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly, with his permission. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 3/22/2022. (Irick, Daniel)
March 8, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Commissioner of Social Security. Related case(s): Yes (Rudy, John)
March 8, 2022 Filing 11 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement re #5 Order by Commissioner of Social Security. (Rudy, John) Modified on 3/9/2022 (SPM).
February 25, 2022 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Alicia M. Boles. (Fugate, Shea)
February 25, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Alicia M. Boles. Related case(s): Yes (Fugate, Shea)
February 25, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Nadine Elder on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Elder, Nadine)
February 22, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Standing Order on Management of Social Security Cases, 3:21-mc-1-TJC, Doc. #43. (BD)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Costs, which the Court construes as a Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, and finding that Plaintiff is a pauper authorized to proceed with the Complaint without payment of a filing fee. See Standing Order on Management of Social Security Cases, 3:21-mc-1-TJC, for information on service and other matters. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 2/22/2022. (Irick, Daniel)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER: Parties have 14 days from the date of this Order to file their Disclosure Statement (if not already filed) and, additionally to notify the Court of a related action by filing a Notice of Related Action, Local Rule 1.07(c), that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District of Florida or elsewhere (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 2/22/2022. (counsel emailed)(AKC)
February 22, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (copies mailed/emailed) (AKC)
February 22, 2022 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:22-cv-0377-GKS-DCI. Motion(s) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. (SJB)
February 21, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Alicia M. Boles. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Fugate, Shea)
February 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Alicia M. Boles. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fugate, Shea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boles v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia M. Boles
Represented By: Shea A. Fugate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John F. Rudy, III
Represented By: Nadine Elder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?