Ashford Leebcor Enterprises, LLC v. Logix Brands, LTD. et al
Plaintiff: Ashford Leebcorp Enterprises, LLC and Ashford Leebcor Enterprises, LLC
Defendant: Logix Brands, LTD. and Perma R Products, Inc. of Tennessee
Case Number: 6:2022cv00538
Filed: March 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Referring Judge: Gregory A Presnell
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER. It is ORDERED that the #16 Order to show cause is hereby DISCHARGED, upon consideration of the #18 Response to order to show cause. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/12/2022. (LAM)
April 11, 2022 Filing 18 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #16 Order to show cause filed by Ashford Leebcor Enterprises, LLC. (Gollin, Lynn)
April 11, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Ashford Leebcor Enterprises, LLC. Related case(s): No (Gollin, Lynn)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER for Plaintiff to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed, which may include dismissal of this case, for failure to respond to the Court's initial case order with regard to the notice of related cases. Show Cause Response due by 4/19/2022. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/5/2022. (LAM)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER: The Order to Show Cause (doc.no. 7) is DISCHARGED. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 3/30/2022. (Baker, David)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Provided counsel shall register for and use the Court's electronic filing system. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 3/30/2022. (Baker, David)
March 30, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing Inadvertently Omitted Exhibit by Ashford Leebcor Enterprises, LLC re #12 Response to order to show cause (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C)(Gollin, Lynn) Modified on 3/31/2022 (matched text to pleading and removed duplicate text)(KNC).
March 29, 2022 Filing 12 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #7 Order to show cause filed by Ashford Leebcor Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of John Karafa, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Gregory S. Bean)(Gollin, Lynn)
March 29, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Gregory S. Bean to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19393939 for $150 by Ashford Leebcor Enterprises, LLC. (Gollin, Lynn) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
March 29, 2022 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Order by Ashford Leebcor Enterprises, LLC. (Gollin, Lynn)
March 29, 2022 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Ashford Leebcor Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Gollin, Lynn)
March 18, 2022 REFUND for duplicate payment. Receipt number $402.00 refunded in the amount of $ AFLMDC-19343183 paid to Gregory Bean.. (NLC)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Standing Discovery Order Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 3/16/2022. (MB)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER to show cause as to Ashford Leebcor Enterprises, LLC. On or before March 30, 2022, Ashford shall show cause in writing why the claim for jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332 should not be dismissed or disregarded due to deficient citizenship. Failure to comply with this Order in the time provided may result in this case being dismissed without further warning. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 3/16/2022. (MB)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/16/2022. (DS)
March 15, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE to counsel Gregory S. Bean Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD)
March 15, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Logix Brands, LTD., Perma R Products, Inc. of Tennessee. (BD)
March 15, 2022 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Gregory A. Presnell and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:22-cv-0538-GAP-GJK. (SJB)
March 15, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-19343424) filed by Ashford Leebcorp Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Gollin, Lynn)
March 15, 2022 Filing 1 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-19343183) filed by Ashford Leebcorp Enterprises, LLC.(Gollin, Lynn) Modified on 3/15/2022 to correct docket text (BD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashford Leebcor Enterprises, LLC v. Logix Brands, LTD. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashford Leebcorp Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Gregory S. Bean
Represented By: Lynn Maynard Gollin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashford Leebcor Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Gregory S. Bean
Represented By: Lynn Maynard Gollin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logix Brands, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perma R Products, Inc. of Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?