Parks et al v. Ivey et al
Plaintiff: Stacey Parks and Tracey Parks
Defendant: Wayne Ivey, Scott Ellis, Rachel Sardoff, John Calkins, Lisa Cullen and Dana Blickley
Case Number: 6:2022cv00576
Filed: March 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Embry J Kidd
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to Amend First Amended Complaint by Stacey Parks, Tracey Parks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Proposed Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Part 1, #3 Exhibit Part 2, #4 Exhibit Part 3, #5 Exhibit Part 4)(SPM)
May 16, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER/OBJECTION to #10 Report and Recommendations by Stacey Parks, Tracey Parks. (SPM)
April 28, 2022 Filing 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #9 MOTION to Amend. Upon consideration, I respectfully recommend that Plaintiffs' Motion #9 be denied, and the Complaint #1 be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 4/28/2022. (CB)
April 11, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to Amend #1 Verified Petition by Stacey Parks, Tracey Parks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Petition, #2 Exhibit Part 1, #3 Exhibit Part 2, #4 Exhibit Part 3, #5 Exhibit Part 4, #6 Exhibit Part 5)(SPM)
April 5, 2022 Filing 8 Rule 7.1 and Local Rule 3.03 Disclosure Statement by Stacey Parks, Tracey Parks. (SPM)
April 5, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Order by Stacey Parks, Tracey Parks. (SPM)
April 5, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Stacey Parks, Tracey Parks. Related case(s): No (SPM)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #1 Motion for Emergency Temporary Restraining Order. On or before April 11, 2022, Plaintiffs shall SHOW CAUSE in writing as to why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Failure to do so will result in the dismissal of this case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 3/22/2022. (MEH) Copies mailed.
March 23, 2022 Set deadlines: Show Cause Response due by 4/11/2022 (SPM)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 3/22/2022. (MEH) Copies mailed.
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 3/22/2022. (MEH) Copies mailed.
March 21, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of lis pendens by Stacey Parks and Tracey Parks (SPM)
March 21, 2022 Filing 1 VERIFIED PETITION and MOTION for Emergency Temporary Restraining Order against All Defendants Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ORL102866 filed by Stacey Parks, Tracey Parks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1,2,3, #2 Exhibit 4,5,6, #3 Exhibit 7,8,9,10, #4 Exhibit 11, #5 Exhibit 13,14,15, #6 Exhibit 16,17, #7 Exhibit 18,19,20, #8 Exhibit 21-28)(SPM) Modified on 3/21/2022 (SPM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parks et al v. Ivey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Ivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Sardoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Calkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Cullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Blickley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?