Banuchi v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Enrique Banuchi
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC and Universal Credit Services, LLC
Case Number: 6:2022cv00588
Filed: March 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Embry J Kidd
Referring Judge: Gregory A Presnell
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2022 Filing 16 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. Mediator: TBD (KNC)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial statement due by 6/9/2023, Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/13/2023 at 01:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell, Jury Trial set for 8/1/2023 at 09:15 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell. Conduct mediation hearing by 5/1/2023. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 5/19/2022. (LAM)
May 18, 2022 Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Geiger, Bryan)
May 12, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Joffe, Jason)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Equifax Information Services, LLC, shall have until May 13, 2022 to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/18/2022. (JSP)
April 18, 2022 Reset deadlines: for Equifax Information Services, LLC. Response to the Complaint due 5/13/2022. (KNC)
April 15, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Equifax Information Services, LLC. Related case(s): No (Joffe, Jason)
April 15, 2022 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Joffe, Jason)
April 15, 2022 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Joffe, Jason)
March 28, 2022 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on March 24, 2022 by Enrique Banuchi as to Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Geiger, Bryan)
March 25, 2022 Filing 7 WAIVER of service returned executed on March 25, 2022 by Enrique Banuchi as to Universal Credit Services, LLC. (Geiger, Bryan)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/24/2022. (DS)
March 23, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Universal Credit Services, LLC. (BD)
March 23, 2022 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Gregory A. Presnell and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:22-cv-0588-GAP-EJK. (SJB)
March 23, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Enrique Banuchi. (Geiger, Bryan)
March 23, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Enrique Banuchi. Related case(s): Yes (Geiger, Bryan)
March 23, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-19372201) filed by Enrique Banuchi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Geiger, Bryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banuchi v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enrique Banuchi
Represented By: Bryan James Geiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Jason Daniel Joffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Credit Services, LLC
Represented By: Christi A. Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?