Ball v. Dolgencorp, LLC
Plaintiff: Kimberly Ball
Defendant: Dolgencorp LLC and Dolgencorp, LLC a Foreign Limited Liability Company doing business as Dollar General
Case Number: 6:2022cv00724
Filed: April 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Embry J Kidd
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of settlement by Dolgencorp, LLC (Hutchinson, Kacie)
April 21, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Kacie Kelly Hutchinson on behalf of Dolgencorp, LLC. Lead Counsel: Kacie K. Hutchinson. (Hutchinson, Kacie)
April 21, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Dolgencorp, LLC.(Hutchinson, Kacie) Modified on 4/22/2022 (SPM).
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/18/2022. (MEH)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/18/2022. (MEH)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 4/18/2022. (PML)
April 15, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE to counsel Miguel Ubiles of Local Rule 2.01(b)(1)(G), which requires members of the Middle District bar to register with the Middle District CM/ECF system by submitting an e-file registration through PACER. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD)
April 15, 2022 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:22-cv-0724-CEM-EJK. (SJB)
April 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of 7th Judicial Circuit, case number 2022 30345 CICI filed in State Court on 3/14/22. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AFLMDC-19462849 filed by Dolgencorp LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hutchinson, Kacie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ball v. Dolgencorp, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Ball
Represented By: Miguel Ubiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolgencorp LLC
Represented By: Kacie Kelly Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolgencorp, LLC a Foreign Limited Liability Company doing business as Dollar General
Represented By: Kacie Kelly Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?