United States Surety Company v. Powercore, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: United States Surety Company
Defendant: Powercore, Inc., Powercore Communications, Inc., Powercore of Florida, Inc., Bryan K. Riley and Marquita J. Riley
Case Number: 6:2022cv00760
Filed: April 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
2 Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Powercore Communications, Inc., Powercore of Florida, Inc., Powercore, Inc., Bryan K. Riley, Marquita J. Riley.(Rigoli, Jason)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Standing Discovery Order Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 4/26/2022. (MB)
April 21, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RMF)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective February 1, 2021 and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 4/21/2022. (RMF)
April 20, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Powercore Communications, Inc., Powercore of Florida, Inc., Powercore, Inc., Bryan K. Riley, Marquita J. Riley. (BD)
April 20, 2022 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:22-cv-00760-WWB-GJK. (APV)
April 20, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Powercore Communications, Inc., Powercore of Florida, Inc., Powercore, Inc., Bryan K. Riley, Marquita J. Riley (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-19480718) filed by United States Surety Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons_Powercore, #3 Proposed Summons_Powercore Communications, #4 Proposed Summons_Powercore of Florida, #5 Proposed Summons_Bryan Riley, #6 Proposed Summons_Marquita Riley)(Mills, E.A.) Modified on 4/20/2022 to correct docket text (BD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Surety Company v. Powercore, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Surety Company
Represented By: E.A. Mills, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Powercore, Inc.
Represented By: Jason Scott Rigoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Powercore Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Jason Scott Rigoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Powercore of Florida, Inc.
Represented By: Jason Scott Rigoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan K. Riley
Represented By: Jason Scott Rigoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marquita J. Riley
Represented By: Jason Scott Rigoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?