Brighthouse Life Insurance Company v. Lawhun et al
Plaintiff: Brighthouse Life Insurance Company and Metlife Investors USA Insurance Company
Defendant: Emmaruth Camasura Lawhun, Christopher Lohr, Julia Lohr, Nadine Lohr, Barbara E. Carte, Debra A. Doucette, Ashley N. Lawhun and Rhonda B. Lawhun
Case Number: 6:2022cv00761
Filed: April 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Leslie Hoffman Price
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1335 Interpleader Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2022 Filing 40 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Emmaruth Camasura Lawhun.(Patten, Lisa) Text modified on 6/14/2022 (RDO).
June 9, 2022 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Order by Emmaruth Camasura Lawhun. (Patten, Lisa)
June 9, 2022 Filing 38 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Emmaruth Camasura Lawhun. Related case(s): No (Patten, Lisa)
June 9, 2022 Filing 37 AMENDED NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa R. Patten on behalf of Emmaruth Camasura Lawhun (Patten, Lisa) Text modified on 6/9/2022 (RDO).
June 9, 2022 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa R. Patten on behalf of Emmaruth Camasura Lawhun (Patten, Lisa)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER DIRECTING COMPLIANCE as to Barbara E. Carte, Debra A. Doucette, Ashley N. Lawhun, Rhonda B. Lawhun. Each Defendant shall file a Certificate of Interested Persons utilizing the attached form within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions without further notice. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/9/2022. (GNB)
June 7, 2022 Filing 34 NOTICE of Related Actions per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Christopher Lohr. Related cases: no. (Partridge, Philip) Modified on 6/8/2022 (RDO).
June 7, 2022 Filing 33 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement re #3 Initial Case Order by Christopher Lohr (Partridge, Philip) Modified on 6/8/2022 (RDO).
June 7, 2022 Filing 32 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to #1 Complaint by Christopher Lohr.(Partridge, Philip) Modified on 6/8/2022 (RDO).
June 2, 2022 Filing 31 WAIVER of service returned executed on 05/31/2022 by Brighthouse Life Insurance Company as to Christopher Lohr. (Quinlan, Winifred)
May 25, 2022 Filing 30 RETURN of service executed on 05/23/2022 by Brighthouse Life Insurance Company as to Emmaruth Camasura Lawhun. (Quinlan, Winifred)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 5/23/2022. (GNB)
May 20, 2022 Filing 28 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Ashley N. Lawhun.(BD)
May 19, 2022 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE of Service by Barbara E. Carte re #20 Answer to Complaint. (BD)
May 19, 2022 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE of Service by Rhonda B. Lawhun re #19 Answer to Complaint. (BD)
May 18, 2022 Filing 25 RETURN of service executed on 05/03/2022 by Brighthouse Life Insurance Company as to Barbara E. Carte. (Quinlan, Winifred)
May 18, 2022 Filing 24 RETURN of service executed on 04/29/2022 by Brighthouse Life Insurance Company as to Debra A. Doucette. (Quinlan, Winifred)
May 18, 2022 Filing 23 RETURN of service executed on 05/03/2022 by Brighthouse Life Insurance Company as to Ashley N. Lawhun. (Quinlan, Winifred)
May 18, 2022 Filing 22 RETURN of service executed on 05/03/2022 by Brighthouse Life Insurance Company as to Rhonda B. Lawhun. (Quinlan, Winifred)
May 18, 2022 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Debra A. Doucette.(BD)
May 18, 2022 Filing 20 ANSWER (signed 5/17/22) to #1 Complaint by Barbara E. Carte. (Received through CM/ECF e-portal on 5/18/22)(BD)
May 18, 2022 Filing 19 ANSWER (signed 5/17/22) to #1 Complaint by Rhonda B. Lawhun. (Received through CM/ECF e-portal on 5/18/22)(BD)
May 13, 2022 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Order by Julia Lohr, Nadine Lohr. (Urban, John)
May 13, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Julia Lohr, Nadine Lohr. Related case(s): No (Urban, John)
May 13, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by John L. Urban on behalf of Julia Lohr, Nadine Lohr (Urban, John)
May 13, 2022 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Julia Lohr, Nadine Lohr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Urban, John) Text modified on 5/16/2022 (RDO).
May 5, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Brighthouse Life Insurance Company. Related case(s): No (Quinlan, Winifred) Modified on 5/5/2022 (RDO).
May 5, 2022 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Order by Brighthouse Life Insurance Company. (Quinlan, Winifred) Modified on 5/5/2022 (RDO).
May 4, 2022 Filing 12 WAIVER of service returned executed on 05/02/2022 by Brighthouse Life Insurance Company as to Nadine Lohr. (Quinlan, Winifred)
May 4, 2022 Filing 11 WAIVER of service returned executed on 05/02/2022 by Brighthouse Life Insurance Company as to Julia Lohr. (Quinlan, Winifred)
May 4, 2022 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on 04/29/2022 by Brighthouse Life Insurance Company as to Debra A. Doucette. (Quinlan, Winifred)
May 4, 2022 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 05/03/2022 by Brighthouse Life Insurance Company as to Ashley N. Lawhun. (Quinlan, Winifred)
April 26, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued as to Debra A. Doucette. (RDO)
April 25, 2022 Filing 7 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Brighthouse Life Insurance Company. (Quinlan, Winifred)
April 25, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Barbara E. Carte, Ashley N. Lawhun, Emmaruth Camasura Lawhun, Rhonda B. Lawhun. (KNC)
April 22, 2022 Filing 5 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Brighthouse Life Insurance Company. (Quinlan, Winifred)
April 22, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Corrected Exhibits A, G and I to Its Complaint for Relief in Interpleader by Brighthouse Life Insurance Company re #1 Complaint (Quinlan, Winifred) Modified on 4/25/2022 (rearranged text) (KNC).
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 4/21/2022. (GNB)
April 20, 2022 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. New case number: 6:22-cv-00761-PGB-LHP. (APV)
April 20, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Relief in Interpleader against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-19480933) filed by Brighthouse Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Civil Cover Sheet)(Quinlan, Winifred) Modified on 4/20/2022 to correct docket text (BD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brighthouse Life Insurance Company v. Lawhun et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brighthouse Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Winifred Helbridg Quinlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metlife Investors USA Insurance Company
Represented By: Winifred Helbridg Quinlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emmaruth Camasura Lawhun
Represented By: Lisa R. Patten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Lohr
Represented By: Philip Leland Partridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julia Lohr
Represented By: John L. Urban
Represented By: Baylor Sherwood Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nadine Lohr
Represented By: John L. Urban
Represented By: Baylor Sherwood Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara E. Carte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra A. Doucette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley N. Lawhun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda B. Lawhun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?