Restoration Army, Inc. v. Federal Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Restoration Army, Inc.
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2022cv00866
Filed: May 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: It is ORDERED that Micah Baxter-Miller file a written response on or before July 13, 2022, as to why sanctions should not be imposed for his failure to comply. Failure to respond shall result in the termination of attorney Micah Baxter-Miller as counsel of record in this case. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 7/6/2022. (RMF)
June 29, 2022 Filing 22 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. Mediator: Kimberly Sands (KNC)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 8/12/2022 Joinder of Parties due by 8/12/2022 Discovery due by 12/1/2023 Dispositive motions due by 1/2/2024 Pretrial statement due by 5/6/2024 All other motions due by 4/3/2024 Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 9/16/2022 Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 10/14/2022 Trial Status Conference set for 5/14/2024 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 3 B before Judge Wendy W. Berger Jury Trial set for trial term commencing 6/3/2024 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 3 B before Judge Wendy W. Berger. Conduct mediation hearing by 12/15/2023. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 6/28/2022. (RMF)
June 24, 2022 Filing 20 RESPONSE re #16 Notice of Motion to Consolidate filed by Restoration Army, Inc.. (Thompson, Kai) Modified on 6/27/2022 (RDO).
June 21, 2022 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Federal Insurance Company. (Salinas, Elizabeth)
June 17, 2022 Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Thompson, Kai)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER re #16 Defendant's Notice of Motion to Consolidate Cases. On or before June 24, 2022, Plaintiff may file a response, not to exceed twenty pages, to [16-1] Defendant's Refiled Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 6/13/2022. (KS)
June 10, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion to Consolidate Cases by Federal Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - refiled motion to consolidate)(Salinas, Elizabeth) Modified on 6/13/2022 (KNC).
June 9, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Restoration Army, Inc. (Thompson, Kai) Modified on 6/10/2022 (SPM).
June 9, 2022 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Restoration Army, Inc.. (Thompson, Kai)
June 9, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Restoration Army, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Thompson, Kai)
June 9, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kai Phillip Thompson on behalf of Restoration Army, Inc. (Thompson, Kai)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER for Micah Baxter-Miller to comply with the administrative procedures regarding electronic filing on or before 6/21/2022. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 6/6/2022. (RMF)
May 16, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Federal Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Policy)(Salinas, Elizabeth)
May 16, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Federal Insurance Company. Related case(s): Yes (Salinas, Elizabeth)
May 13, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RMF)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective February 1, 2021 and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 5/13/2022. (RMF)
May 10, 2022 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Federal Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate Chubb Limited, Other Affiliate Chubb Group Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate Chubb INA Holdings Inc. for Federal Insurance Company. (Salinas, Elizabeth)
May 10, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE to counsel Micah Baxter-Miller of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD)
May 10, 2022 Filing 4 Certification of NOTICE of Removal by Federal Insurance Company (Salinas, Elizabeth) Modified on 5/11/2022 (matched text to pleading) (KNC).
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 2/1/2021. (RN)
May 9, 2022 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:22-cv-866-WWB-DCI. (NAS)
May 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 18th Judicial Circuit in and for Seminole County, case number 2022cc001177 filed in State Court on April 11, 2022. Filing fee $402, receipt number AFLMDC-19548981 filed by Federal Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint and state court filings, #2 Exhibit 2 - FL Division of Corp Business Record, #3 Exhibit 3- Estimate from DDA, #4 Memorandum of Law in Support of Notice of Removal, #5 State Court Docket Sheet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Salinas, Elizabeth) Modified on 5/10/2022 to correct docket text (BD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Restoration Army, Inc. v. Federal Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Restoration Army, Inc.
Represented By: Micah Baxter-Miller
Represented By: Kai Phillip Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Elizabeth Salinas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?