Kemp v. Brigan Inc.
Plaintiff: Bobby M. Kemp
Defendant: Brigan Inc.
Case Number: 6:2022cv00909
Filed: May 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Embry J Kidd
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 0151 Labor: Review of Agency Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2022 Set/reset deadlines/hearings: Amended Complaint due by 7/22/2022 (RDO)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying without prejudice #10 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 7/1/2022. (IRM)
June 23, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Bobby M. Kemp. (RDO) Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #6 Prisoner Consent Form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 6/13/2022. (IRM)
June 6, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Order by Bobby M. Kemp. (KNC)
June 6, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Bobby M. Kemp. Related case(s): No (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(KNC)
June 1, 2022 Filing 6 PRISONER consent form and financial certificate by Bobby M. Kemp. (RDO)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis . Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 5/17/2022. (IRM)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 5/17/2022. (GNB)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 5/17/2022. (GNB)
May 16, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Bobby M. Kemp. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(RDO) Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
May 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brigan Inc. filed by Bobby M. Kemp. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Mailing Envelope)(RDO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kemp v. Brigan Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby M. Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brigan Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?