Garzon et al v. National Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: diego garzon, martha prieto and Martha Yolima Prieto
Defendant: National Specialty Insurance Co and National Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2022cv00919
Filed: May 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: David A Baker
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
2 Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2022 Filing 10 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Baker. New case number: 6:22-cv-919-CEM-DAB. US Magistrate Judge Gregory J Kelly no longer assigned to the case. (SMG)
June 3, 2022 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement re #5 Order by National Specialty Insurance Company. (Williams, Robert) Modified on 6/6/2022 (SPM).
June 3, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by National Specialty Insurance Company. Related case(s): No (Williams, Robert)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 5/24/2022. (TNP)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 5/20/2022. (ALL)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 5/20/2022. (ALL)
May 19, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsel Vinit Roy Venkatesh of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD)
May 19, 2022 Filing 3 Entered in error (TNP).
May 18, 2022 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:22-cv-0919-CEM-GJK. (SJB)
May 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Osceola Circuit Court, case number 2022CA 000885 filed in State Court on 04/07/2022. Filing fee $402, receipt number AFLMDC-19585876 filed by National Specialty Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 State Court Answer, #11 State Court Complaint)(Williams, Robert) Modified on 5/19/2022 to correct docket text (BD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garzon et al v. National Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: diego garzon
Represented By: Vinit Roy Venkatesh
Represented By: Vin Roy Venkatesh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: martha prieto
Represented By: Vinit Roy Venkatesh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Yolima Prieto
Represented By: Vin Roy Venkatesh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Specialty Insurance Co
Represented By: Robert L Williams, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian P. Henry
Represented By: Robert L Williams, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?