Anderson v. The City of Daytona Beach Municipal et al
Plaintiff: Shirley Baker Anderson and Shirley Baker
Defendant: Suntrust Mortgage of Virginia, The City of Daytona Beach Municipal, Rayan Bell President, Midland Funding LLC/Midland Credit Management (MCM) doing business as CSM22019 RPL3 Trust, Truist Bank, Gary M. Glassman, Robert Scott Kahane & Associates, Thomas Crowder, Cindy Wolper Borizillo, Rorick F. Willis, II, Josee Rodriguiz Luis, III doing business as Rodriguiz Realty Acquisitions and Development, Inc. and Midland Funding LLC
Case Number: 6:2022cv01417
Filed: August 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Referring Judge: Leslie Hoffman Price
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2022 Filing 22 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by The City of Daytona Beach Municipal. (Glassman, Gary)
October 7, 2022 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Shirley Baker Anderson. (SPM)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER denying #19 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g). Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 10/7/2022. (JW)
October 5, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by The City of Daytona Beach Municipal. (Glassman, Gary)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying #15 Motion for Recusal. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 9/21/2022. (MEH)
September 15, 2022 Filing 16 SUMMONS issued as to The City of Daytona Beach Municipal. (KNC)
September 13, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Recusal by Shirley Baker Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(SRD)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Motion to Reopen Case. The Clerk is directed to reopen this case. However, Plaintiff is reminded that even parties proceeding pro se must comply with the Local Rules and Court Orders. Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 9/13/2022. (JW)
September 8, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Shirley Baker Anderson. Related case(s): Yes (SPM)
September 8, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Reopen Case by Shirley Baker Anderson. (SPM)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER dismissing case without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to close this file. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 9/7/2022. (MEH)
September 7, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint by Shirley Baker Anderson. (SPM)
September 2, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Compel Defendants to Compliance by Shirley Baker Anderson. (SPM) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price.
August 25, 2022 Filing 8 Amended CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #2 Order by Shirley Baker Anderson. (SPM)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER striking #5 Unilateral Case Management Report and #6 Unilateral Amended Case Management Report. Local Rule 3.02 requires a joint case management report to be filed within forty days after any defendant appears in this action. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 8/24/2022. (KMS)
August 23, 2022 Filing 6 **STRICKEN per 7 Order** Unilateral Amended CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (SPM) Modified on 8/25/2022 (SPM).
August 23, 2022 Filing 5 **STRICKEN per 7 Order** Unilateral CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (SPM) Modified on 8/25/2022 (SPM).
August 23, 2022 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #2 Order by Shirley Baker Anderson. (SPM)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 8/16/2022. (ALL)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 8/16/2022. (ALL)
August 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee $402, receipt number ORL104723 filed by Shirley Baker Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(SPM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. The City of Daytona Beach Municipal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Baker Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suntrust Mortgage of Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Daytona Beach Municipal
Represented By: Gary M. Glassman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rayan Bell President, Midland Funding LLC/Midland Credit Management (MCM) doing business as CSM22019 RPL3 Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truist Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary M. Glassman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Scott Kahane & Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Crowder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Wolper Borizillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rorick F. Willis, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josee Rodriguiz Luis, III doing business as Rodriguiz Realty Acquisitions and Development, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?