Government Employees Insurance Co. et al v. Utter et al
Plaintiff: Government Employees Insurance Co., GEICO Indemnity Co., Geico General Insurance Company and GEICO Casualty Co.
Defendant: D.C. Ronald Jack Travis Utter, No Utter Way doing business as Preferred Injury Physicians, Halifax Chiropractic & Injury Clinic, Inc., Preferred Injury Physicians of Brandon, Inc., Preferred Injury Physicians of Kissimmee, Inc., Preferred Injury Physicians of Town & Country, Inc., Preferred Injury Physicians of Orange City, Inc. doing business as Preferred Injury Physicians of Deltona, Preferred Injury Physicians of Wesley Chapel, Inc., Preferred Injury Physicians of Temple Terrace, Inc., Preferred Injury Physicians of St. Petersburg, Inc., Preferred Injury Physicians of East Orlando, Inc. and Ronald Jack Travis Utter, D.C.
Case Number: 6:2022cv01711
Filed: September 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Embry J Kidd
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2022 Reset deadlines: for All Defendants. Answer due by 11/28/2022. (SPM)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part #25 Motion for Extension of Time. Without additional information as to the specific impact of Hurricane Nicole on the defendants or defense counsel, the undersigned finds that the hurricane itself justifies, at most, a 3-day extension, which the Court will extend to 7 days because of the Thanksgiving holiday. Accordingly, Defendants may have until and through November 28, 2022, to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 11/16/2022. (Kidd, Embry)
November 16, 2022 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to December 5, 2022, to File Response re #1 Complaint by All Defendants. (Rosenberg, Bruce) Modified on 11/16/2022 (SPM).
October 13, 2022 Set deadlines: for All Defendants. Answer due by 11/21/2022. (SPM)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ENDORSED ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants may have until and through November 21, 2022, to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 10/13/2022. (Kidd, Embry)
October 13, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce S. Rosenberg on behalf of Halifax Chiropractic & Injury Clinic, Inc., No Utter Way, Preferred Injury Physicians of Brandon, Inc., Preferred Injury Physicians of East Orlando, Inc., Preferred Injury Physicians of Kissimmee, Inc., Preferred Injury Physicians of Orange City, Inc., Preferred Injury Physicians of St. Petersburg, Inc., Preferred Injury Physicians of Temple Terrace, Inc., Preferred Injury Physicians of Town & Country, Inc., Preferred Injury Physicians of Wesley Chapel, Inc., Ronald Jack Travis Utter, D.C. (Rosenberg, Bruce)
October 13, 2022 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time by All Defendants. (Rosenberg, Bruce) Modified on 10/14/2022 (SPM).
October 10, 2022 Filing 21 RETURN of service executed on 9/22/22 by Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co., Geico Casualty Co., Government Employees Insurance Co. as to Preferred Injury Physicians of Orange City, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service for Preferred Injury Physicians of Orange City, Inc. d/b/a Preferred Injury Physicians of Deltona)(Wenger, Kristen)
October 10, 2022 Filing 20 RETURN of service executed on 9/22/22 by Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co., Geico Casualty Co., Government Employees Insurance Co. as to Halifax Chiropractic & Injury Clinic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service for Halifax Chiropractic & Injury Clinic, Inc.)(Wenger, Kristen)
October 10, 2022 Filing 19 RETURN of service executed on 9/22/22 by Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co., Geico Casualty Co., Government Employees Insurance Co. as to No Utter Way. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service for No Utter Way dba Preferred Injury Physicians)(Wenger, Kristen)
October 10, 2022 Filing 18 RETURN of service executed on 9/22/22 by Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co., Geico Casualty Co., Government Employees Insurance Co. as to Preferred Injury Physicians of Brandon, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service for Preferred Injury Physicians of Brandon, Inc.)(Wenger, Kristen)
October 10, 2022 Filing 17 RETURN of service executed on 9/22/22 by Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co., Geico Casualty Co., Government Employees Insurance Co. as to Preferred Injury Physicians of St. Petersburg, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service for Preferred Injury Physicians of St. Petersburg, Inc.)(Wenger, Kristen)
October 10, 2022 Filing 16 RETURN of service executed on 9/22/22 by Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co., Geico Casualty Co., Government Employees Insurance Co. as to Preferred Injury Physicians of Wesley Chapel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service for Preferred Physicians of Wesley Chapel, Inc.)(Wenger, Kristen)
October 10, 2022 Filing 15 RETURN of service executed on 9/22/22 by Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co., Geico Casualty Co., Government Employees Insurance Co. as to Preferred Injury Physicians of Town & Country, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service for Preferred Injury Physicans of Town & County, Inc.)(Wenger, Kristen)
October 10, 2022 Filing 14 RETURN of service executed on 9/22/22 by Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co., Geico Casualty Co., Government Employees Insurance Co. as to Preferred Injury Physicians of Kissimmee, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service for Preferred Injury Physicians of Kissimmee Inc.)(Wenger, Kristen)
October 10, 2022 Filing 13 RETURN of service executed on 9/22/22 by Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co., Geico Casualty Co., Government Employees Insurance Co. as to Preferred Injury Physicians of East Orlando, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service for Preferred Injury Physicians of East Orlando Inc.)(Wenger, Kristen)
October 10, 2022 Filing 12 RETURN of service executed on 9/22/22 by Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co., Geico Casualty Co., Government Employees Insurance Co. as to Ronald Jack Travis Utter, D.C.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service for Ronald Jack Travis Utter, D.C.)(Wenger, Kristen)
October 10, 2022 Filing 11 RETURN of service executed on 9/22/22 by Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co., Geico Casualty Co., Government Employees Insurance Co. as to Preferred Injury Physicians of Temple Terrace, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service for Preferred Injury Physicans of Temple Terrace, Inc.)(Wenger, Kristen)
September 29, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Max Gershenoff on behalf of Geico Casualty Co., Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co. (Gershenoff, Max)
September 27, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Henesy on behalf of Geico Casualty Co., Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co. (Henesy, Steven)
September 22, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Geico Casualty Co., Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co.. Related case(s): No (Marino, John)
September 22, 2022 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement re #5 Order by Geico Casualty Co., Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co.. (Marino, John) Modified on 9/22/2022 (SPM).
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 9/20/2022. (MEH)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 9/20/2022. (MEH)
September 20, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (SRD)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 9/20/2022. (PML)
September 19, 2022 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:22-cv-1711-CEM-EJK. (NAS)
September 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-20010532) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Utter Way, #2 Exhibit 2 - Halifax, #3 Exhibit 3 - Brandon, #4 Exhibit 4 - Kissimmee, #5 Exhibit 5 - Town & Country, #6 Exhibit 6 - Orange City, #7 Exhibit 7 - Wesley Chapel, #8 Exhibit 8 - Temple Terrace, #9 Exhibit 9 - St. Peterburg, #10 Exhibit 10 - East Orlando, #11 Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Proposed Summons)(Marino, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Government Employees Insurance Co. et al v. Utter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Government Employees Insurance Co.
Represented By: John Patrick Marino
Represented By: Kristen Lindsay Wenger
Represented By: Lindsey R. Trowell
Represented By: Max Gershenoff
Represented By: Steven T. Henesy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO Indemnity Co.
Represented By: John Patrick Marino
Represented By: Kristen Lindsay Wenger
Represented By: Lindsey R. Trowell
Represented By: Max Gershenoff
Represented By: Steven T. Henesy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geico General Insurance Company
Represented By: John Patrick Marino
Represented By: Kristen Lindsay Wenger
Represented By: Lindsey R. Trowell
Represented By: Max Gershenoff
Represented By: Steven T. Henesy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO Casualty Co.
Represented By: John Patrick Marino
Represented By: Kristen Lindsay Wenger
Represented By: Lindsey R. Trowell
Represented By: Max Gershenoff
Represented By: Steven T. Henesy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.C. Ronald Jack Travis Utter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: No Utter Way doing business as Preferred Injury Physicians
Represented By: Bruce S. Rosenberg
Represented By: Alexis Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halifax Chiropractic & Injury Clinic, Inc.
Represented By: Alexis Rosenberg
Represented By: Bruce S. Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preferred Injury Physicians of Brandon, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce S. Rosenberg
Represented By: Alexis Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preferred Injury Physicians of Kissimmee, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce S. Rosenberg
Represented By: Alexis Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preferred Injury Physicians of Town & Country, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce S. Rosenberg
Represented By: Alexis Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preferred Injury Physicians of Orange City, Inc. doing business as Preferred Injury Physicians of Deltona
Represented By: Bruce S. Rosenberg
Represented By: Alexis Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preferred Injury Physicians of Wesley Chapel, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce S. Rosenberg
Represented By: Alexis Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preferred Injury Physicians of Temple Terrace, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce S. Rosenberg
Represented By: Alexis Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preferred Injury Physicians of St. Petersburg, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce S. Rosenberg
Represented By: Alexis Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preferred Injury Physicians of East Orlando, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce S. Rosenberg
Represented By: Alexis Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Jack Travis Utter, D.C.
Represented By: Bruce S. Rosenberg
Represented By: Alexis Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?