Lam v. Books-A-Million, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jeremy Lam
Defendant: Books-A-Million, Inc. and Booksamillion.com, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2022cv01717
Filed: September 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER re #34 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants--Books-Million, Inc. and Booksamillion.com, Inc.--are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close the file. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 10/19/2022. (ACZ)
October 18, 2022 Filing 34 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Jeremy Lam (Lowther, Edwin)
October 6, 2022 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Jeremy Lam. (Ross, Courtney)
October 6, 2022 Filing 32 NOTICE of Related Actions by Books-A-Million, Inc., Booksamillion.com, Inc. (Leiva, Aldo) Modified on 10/7/2022 to edit the docket text (RPB).
October 6, 2022 Filing 31 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Books-A-Million, Inc., Booksamillion.com, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Books-A-Million, Inc. for Booksamillion.com, Inc.; Corporate Parent Family Acquisition Holding, LLC for Books-A-Million, Inc... (Leiva, Aldo)
October 6, 2022 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Jeremy Lam. (Ross, Courtney)
October 6, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Actions by Jeremy Lam (Ross, Courtney) Modified on 10/7/2022 to edit the docket text (RPB).
October 4, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Sobol on behalf of Jeremy Lam (Sobol, Michael)
October 4, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney Elizabeth Ross on behalf of Jeremy Lam (Ross, Courtney)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ENDORSED ORDER granting #24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Michael W. Sobol is granted special admission to practice in the Middle District for purposes of this action pursuant to Local Rule 2.01(c), provided counsel shall register for and use the electronic filing system as adopted by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 10/4/2022. (Irick, Daniel)
October 3, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Ian Cuthbertson on behalf of Jeremy Lam (Cuthbertson, Douglas)
October 3, 2022 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Michael W. Sobol to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20052303 for $150 by Jeremy Lam. (Phillips, Jacob) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ENDORSED ORDER granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Courtney E. Ross is granted special admission to practice in the Middle District for purposes of this action pursuant to Local Rule 2.01(c), provided counsel shall register for and use the electronic filing system as adopted by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 10/3/2022. (Irick, Daniel)
October 3, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III on behalf of Jeremy Lam (Bates, Joseph)
October 3, 2022 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Courtney E. Ross to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20051088 for $150 by Jeremy Lam. (Phillips, Jacob) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III is granted special admission to practice in the Middle District for purposes of this action pursuant to Local Rule 2.01(c), provided counsel shall register for and use the electronic filing system as adopted by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 10/3/2022. (Irick, Daniel)
October 3, 2022 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20049546 for $150 by Jeremy Lam. (Phillips, Jacob) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Douglas I. Cuthbertson is granted special admission to practice in the Middle District for purposes of this action pursuant to Local Rule 2.01(c), provided counsel shall register for and use the electronic filing system as adopted by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 9/30/2022. (Irick, Daniel)
September 28, 2022 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Douglas I. Cuthbertson to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20043097 for $150 by Jeremy Lam. (Phillips, Jacob) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
September 28, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Edwin Lee Lowther III Appearance by Edwin Lee Lowther on behalf of Jeremy Lam (Lowther, Edwin)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Edwin Lee Lowther III is granted special admission to practice in the Middle District for purposes of this action pursuant to Local Rule 2.01(c), provided counsel shall register for and use the electronic filing system as adopted by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 9/26/2022. (Irick, Daniel)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/2/2020. (TNP)
September 23, 2022 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Edwin Lee Lowther III to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20031735 for $150 by Jeremy Lam. (Phillips, Jacob) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
September 23, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary B. Busey on behalf of Books-A-Million, Inc., Booksamillion.com, Inc. (Busey, Zachary)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Zachary B. Busey is granted special admission to practice in the Middle District for purposes of this action pursuant to Local Rule 2.01(c), provided counsel shall register for and use the electronic filing system as adopted by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 9/23/2022. (Irick, Daniel)
September 23, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Zachary B. Busey to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20028484 for $150 by All Defendants. (Docheva, Desislava) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants must respond to the Complaint by 10/27/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 9/23/2022. (Irick, Daniel)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines for both Plaintiff and Defendants. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/22/2022. (AKC)
September 22, 2022 Filing 7 Case Reassigned to Judge Paul G. Byron. New case number: 6:22-cv-1717-PGB-DCI. Judge Gregory A. Presnell no longer assigned to the case. (SJB)
September 22, 2022 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Books-A-Million, Inc., Booksamillion.com, Inc. (Docheva, Desislava) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 9/22/2022. (RPB)
September 21, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsel Zachary B. Busey, Joseph Henry Bates, III, Lee Lowther, Courtney E. Ross, Michael W. Sobol and Douglas I. Cuthbertson Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRD)
September 21, 2022 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Gregory A. Presnell and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:22-cv-1717-GAP-DCI. (SJB)
September 20, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation on behalf of Books-A-Million, Inc., Booksamillion.com, Inc. (Leiva, Aldo) Modified on 9/21/2022 to edit docket text (SRD).
September 20, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Circuit Courty case number 2022-CA-007867-O filed in State Court on 8/25/2022. Filing fee $402, receipt number AFLMDC-20013618 filed by Booksamillion.com, Inc., Books-A-Million, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Docheva, Desislava) Modified on 9/21/2022 to edit docket text (SRD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lam v. Books-A-Million, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Lam
Represented By: Jacob Lawrence Phillips
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Represented By: Douglas Ian Cuthbertson
Represented By: Edwin Lee Lowther
Represented By: Courtney Elizabeth Ross
Represented By: Michael Sobol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Books-A-Million, Inc.
Represented By: Aldo M. Leiva
Represented By: Desislava Docheva
Represented By: Zachary B. Busey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Booksamillion.com, Inc.
Represented By: Aldo M. Leiva
Represented By: Desislava Docheva
Represented By: Zachary B. Busey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?