Nasir v. Papa John's International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jamal Nasir
Defendant: Papa John's International, Inc., Papa John's USA, Inc. and Papa John's International, Inc. doing business as Papa Johns
Case Number: 6:2022cv02006
Filed: November 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: David A Baker
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER directing the Clerk Court to close this case re #33 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 1/9/2023. (MEH)
January 6, 2023 Filing 33 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal without prejudice by Jamal Nasir (Cohen, Jonathan) Modified on 1/6/2023 to edit docket text (SRD).
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #31 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to February 6, 2023, to File Response/Reply as to #26 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Responses due by 2/6/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 1/5/2023. (JPR)
January 4, 2023 Set deadlines: Case management report due by 1/10/2023 (SPM)
January 4, 2023 Filing 31 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #26 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Jamal Nasir. (Cohen, Jonathan)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #29 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to January 10, 2023, to File Case Management Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 1/4/2023. (JPR)
January 3, 2023 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to January 10, 2023, to File Case Management Report by Papa John's International, Inc., Papa John's USA, Inc. (Blystone, Bradley) Modified on 1/3/2023 (SPM).
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ENDORSED ORDER denying #27 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Stay. The Court cannot manage its busy docket when deadlines are suspended pending ruling on a motion. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 1/3/2023. (VLC)
December 29, 2022 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION to Stay re #26 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Papa John's International, Inc., Papa John's USA, Inc. (Blystone, Bradley) Modified on 12/29/2022 to edit docket text (SRD).
December 29, 2022 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Papa John's International, Inc., Papa John's USA, Inc. (Blystone, Bradley) Modified on 12/29/2022 to edit docket text (SRD).
December 9, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Bradley P. Blystone on behalf of Papa John's International, Inc., Papa John's USA, Inc.. Lead Counsel: Emily Johnson Henn. (Blystone, Bradley)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ENDORSED ORDER granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; and granting #23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, provided counsel shall register for and use the Court's electronic filing system. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 12/8/2022. (JPR)
December 7, 2022 Filing 23 MOTION for Emily Johnson Henn to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20278239 for $150 by Papa John's International, Inc., Papa John's USA, Inc.. (Blystone, Bradley) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge David A. Baker.
December 7, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION for Eric C. Bosset to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20278202 for $150 by Papa John's International, Inc., Papa John's USA, Inc.. (Blystone, Bradley) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge David A. Baker.
December 7, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION for Ziwei Song to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20278081 for $150 by Papa John's International, Inc., Papa John's USA, Inc.. (Blystone, Bradley) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge David A. Baker.
December 7, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Papa John's International, Inc., Papa John's USA, Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (Blystone, Bradley)
December 7, 2022 Filing 19 Disclosure Statement re #7 Order by Papa John's International, Inc., Papa John's USA, Inc. (Blystone, Bradley) Modified on 12/7/2022 (SPM).
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #17 Unopposed MOTION for MaryBeth V. Gibson to appear pro hac vice, provided counsel shall register for and use the Court's electronic filing system. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 12/7/2022. (JPR)
December 6, 2022 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for MaryBeth V. Gibson to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20274602 for $150 by Jamal Nasir. (Cohen, Jonathan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge David A. Baker.
December 1, 2022 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Standing Order, #7 Order by Jamal Nasir. (Cohen, Jonathan)
December 1, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Jamal Nasir. Related case(s): Yes (Cohen, Jonathan)
November 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to January 6, 2023, to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint. Responses due by 1/6/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 11/25/2022. (JPR)
November 23, 2022 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to January 6, 2023, to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Papa John's International, Inc., Papa John's USA, Inc. (Blystone, Bradley) Modified on 11/23/2022 (SPM).
November 23, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley P. Blystone on behalf of Papa John's International, Inc., Papa John's USA, Inc. (Blystone, Bradley)
November 21, 2022 Filing 11 RETURN of service executed on 11/7/2022 by Jamal Nasir as to Papa John's International, Inc.. (Cohen, Jonathan)
November 21, 2022 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on 11/4/2022 by Jamal Nasir as to Papa John's USA, Inc.. (Cohen, Jonathan)
November 21, 2022 Filing 9 (WRONG PDF. REFILED AT #11.)RETURN of service executed on 11/7/2022 by Jamal Nasir as to Papa John's International, Inc. (Cohen, Jonathan) Modified on 11/21/2022 (SPM).
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 11/16/2022. (MEH)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 11/16/2022. (MEH)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 11/3/2022. (JW)
November 3, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (didn't have the service address listed, called Attorney Cohen left message for him to refile) (SRD)
November 3, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsel MaryBeth V. Gibson and Gary M. Klinger Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRD)
November 3, 2022 Filing 3 Case Reassigned to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza. New case number: 6:22-cv-2006-CEM-DAB. Judge Anne C. Conway no longer assigned to the case. (NAS)
November 2, 2022 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Anne C. Conway and Magistrate Judge David A. Baker. New case number: 6:22-cv-02006-ACC-DAB. (APV)
November 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-20153780) filed by Jamal Nasir. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Cohen, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nasir v. Papa John's International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamal Nasir
Represented By: Jonathan Betten Cohen
Represented By: MaryBeth V. Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Papa John's International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Papa John's USA, Inc.
Represented By: Ziwei Song
Represented By: Emily Johnson Henn
Represented By: Bradley P. Blystone
Represented By: Eric C. Bosset
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Papa John's International, Inc. doing business as Papa Johns
Represented By: Eric C. Bosset
Represented By: Emily Johnson Henn
Represented By: Bradley P. Blystone
Represented By: Ziwei Song
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?