Lowman et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: William Lowman and Ryan Campbell
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 6:2022cv02058
Filed: November 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Leslie Hoffman Price
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7422 IRS: Refund Taxes
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 11/16/2022. (GNB)
November 8, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsel John Gerald DeLancett and Robert Clayton Roesch of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LDJ)
November 7, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Ryan Campbell, William Lowman. (LDJ) Modified file date on 11/8/2022 (LDJ).
November 7, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to United States of America and U.S. Attorney. (LDJ) Modified file date on 11/8/2022 (LDJ).
November 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number ORL105802) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LDJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lowman et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Lowman
Represented By: John Gerald DeLancett
Represented By: Robert Clayton Roesch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Campbell
Represented By: John Gerald DeLancett
Represented By: Robert Clayton Roesch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?