Streams of Life Worship Center v. Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Streams of Life Worship Center
Defendant: Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2023cv01891
Filed: September 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Leslie Hoffman Price
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying without prejudice #15 Joint Motion to Substitute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 11/14/2023. (MKH)
November 14, 2023 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Streams of Life Worship Center. (Diamond, Peter) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price.
November 7, 2023 Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Razzano, Amber)
November 7, 2023 Filing 13 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Streams of Life Worship Center. (Diamond, Peter)
November 6, 2023 Filing 12 ***Counsel notified to refile using correct event code*** NOTICE by Streams of Life Worship Center of Corporate Disclosure (Diamond, Peter) Modified text on 11/7/2023 (MCB).
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER for Anais Saavedra to comply with the administrative procedures regarding electronic filing on or before 11/15/2023. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 11/1/2023. (RMF)
October 24, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Peter Alexander Diamond on behalf of Streams of Life Worship Center. Lead Counsel: Peter A. Diamond, Esq. (Diamond, Peter) Modified on 10/24/2023 to edit text (ABC).
October 17, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RMF)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective February 1, 2021 and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. Additionally, the undersigned has issued Standing Orders, available at https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/judges/wendy-berger, that apply to all proceedings before the undersigned. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules and this Court's Standing Orders. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 10/17/2023. (RMF)
October 12, 2023 Filing 7 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Zimmer Financial Services Group LLC, formerly Sequentis Financial, LLC, Other Affiliate Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Ategrity Specialty Holdings LLC for Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company. (McLean, Patricia) Modified text on 10/13/2023 (KME).
October 3, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company. Related case(s): Yes (McLean, Patricia)
October 3, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Patricia A. McLean on behalf of Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company. Lead Counsel: Patricia A. McLean. (McLean, Patricia)
October 3, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Anais Saavedra of Local Rule 2.01(b)(1)(G), which requires members of the Middle District bar to register with the Middle District CM/ECF system by submitting an e-file registration through PACER. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JK)
October 2, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Patricia A. McLean; Amber N. Razzano; Natasha A. Rivera; Anais Saavedra of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LMW)
September 29, 2023 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. New case number: 6:23-cv-1891-WWB-LHP. (AA)
September 29, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL of a Civil Action from Orange County Circuit Court, case number 2023-CA-014763-O filed in State Court on 8/25/2023. Filing fee $402, receipt number AFLMDC-21305985 filed by Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court ANSWER, #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 State Court Other Documents, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(McLean, Patricia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Streams of Life Worship Center v. Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Streams of Life Worship Center
Represented By: Anais Saavedra
Represented By: Natasha Alexandra Rivera
Represented By: Peter Alexander Diamond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Amber N Razzano
Represented By: Patricia A. McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?