Fortunat v. Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Nicole Fortunat
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Not Classified By Court: Curtright Truitt
Case Number: 6:2023cv01893
Filed: September 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 4/1/2024, Joinder of Parties due by 4/1/2024, Discovery due by 12/6/2024, Dispositive motions due by 1/10/2025, Pretrial statement due by 5/8/2025, All other motions due by 4/24/2025, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 8/27/2024, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 9/27/2024, Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/15/2025 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. Jury Trial set for term commencing 6/2/2025 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. Conduct mediation hearing by 12/15/2024. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 11/16/2023. (ALL)
November 3, 2023 Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Sinclair, Gal)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER DISCHARGING the Order to Show Cause (Doc. #12) in light of Defendant's response (Doc. #15). Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/24/2023. (JWG)
October 23, 2023 Filing 15 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #12 Order to show cause filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Declaration of Corey Parker of Advantage Surveillance & Investigations, #2 Exhibit B. Certified Copy of the Policy, #3 Exhibit C. Warranty Deed, #4 Exhibit D. 2010 to 2022 Homestead Real Estate Tax Notice showing Paid)(Scott, Latasha)
October 18, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Alyssa Philippi on behalf of Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Philippi, Alyssa)
October 17, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Nicole Fortunat. Related case(s): No (Sinclair, Gal)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ***DISCHARGED PURSUANT TO 16 ENDORSED ORDER*** By Monday, October 30, 2023, Defendant is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE by written response why this case should not be remanded due to deficient jurisdictional allegations. Failure to timely and adequately respond may result in this action being remanded. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/16/2023. (ALL) Modified on 10/24/2023 (LSS).
October 10, 2023 Filing 11 Remark: Doc. #10 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/10/2023. (JWG)
October 5, 2023 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Order by Nicole Fortunat. (Sinclair, Gal)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/3/2023. (ALL)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/2/2020. (TNP)
September 29, 2023 Filing 7 Liberty ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Policy)(Scott, Latasha)
September 29, 2023 Filing 6 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:23-cv-1893-RBD-DCI. (AA)
September 29, 2023 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Local Rule 3.03 by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc. for Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Scott, Latasha)
September 29, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. Related case(s): No (Scott, Latasha)
September 29, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Latasha Lordes Chanell Scott on behalf of Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Scott, Latasha)
September 29, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Latasha Lordes Chanell Scott on behalf of Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. Lead Counsel: Matthew J. Lavisky. (Scott, Latasha)
September 29, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the 9th Judicial Circuit for Orange County, case number 2023-CA-014823-O filed in State Court on August 28, 2023. Filing fee $402, receipt number AFLMDC-21306311 filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Property Insurance Notice of Intent to Initiate Litigation, #2 Exhibit B - Global Public Adjusters Estimate, #3 Exhibit C - Tarp and restore invoice from East Coast Water Restoration, #4 Exhibit D - Demolition invoice from East Coast Water Restoration, #5 Exhibit E - Mold Invoice from East Coast Water Restoration, #6 Exhibit F - Policy, #7 State Court COMPLAINT, #8 State Court Docket Sheet, #9 State Court Other Documents, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scott, Latasha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fortunat v. Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Fortunat
Represented By: Gal Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew J. Lavisky
Represented By: Latasha Lordes Chanell Scott
Represented By: Alyssa Philippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Curtright Truitt
Represented By: Curtright C. Truitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?