Longra Perez v. Servello & Son, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Katiria Longra Perez
Defendant: Servello & Son, Inc. and Gregory Servello
Case Number: 6:2024cv00757
Filed: April 23, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Referring Judge: Robert M Norway
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2024 Filing 25 NOTICE of Amending and Supplementing 3.01(g) Certification by Katiria Longra Perez re #21 MOTION for Reconsideration re #19 Order Dismissing Case. (Costa, Jorge)
June 14, 2024 Filing 24 ANSWER to court interrogatories by Katiria Longra Perez re #15 Case Management Scheduling Order (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Plaintiff's Jurat Sheet)(Costa, Jorge) Modified text on 6/17/2024 (HAI).
June 14, 2024 Filing 23 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Katiria Longra Perez. Related case(s): Yes (Costa, Jorge)
June 14, 2024 Filing 22 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Katiria Longra Perez. (Costa, Jorge)
June 14, 2024 Filing 21 MOTION for Reconsideration re #19 Order Dismissing Case by Katiria Longra Perez. (Georges-Pierre, Anthony)
June 3, 2024 Filing 20 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LSS)
May 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER dismissing case without prejudice. Any motion for reconsideration must be filed within fourteen days of this order, comply with all Local Rules, and include the following: a certification that the lead attorney has personally read the Court's Initial Order and the Local Rules cited therein; an explanation for why the deadline was missed; and as separate docket entries, all missing filings. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 5/31/2024. (MEH)
May 28, 2024 Filing 18 JOINT NOTICE Advising the Court by Gregory Servello, Servello & Son, Inc. (Ortiz, Kelsey) Modified on 5/29/2024 to edit docket text (JDR).
May 22, 2024 Filing 17 Minute Entry. Virtual Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway: IDEAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE held on 5/22/2024. (Digital/Zoom) (LDJ)
May 1, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of hearing: re: #8 Notice of Referral to IDEAL Program. Case Management Conference set for 5/22/2024 at 10:00 AM in Zoom Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway. A Zoom link will be sent to counsel via email. (LDJ)
May 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FLSA SCHEDULING ORDER: By 5/22/2024 parties shall serve copies upon each other as stated in the order; By 7/10/2024 parties are to meet and confer; Answer to court interrogatories due by 6/12/2024 Settlement Report due by 7/24/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 5/1/2024. (JBS)
May 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Motion for Case Management Conference. A zoom hearing will be set via separate notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 5/1/2024. (JBS)
April 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FLSA ORDER OF REFERENCE- This case is hereby referred to the Magistrate Judge for issuance of the FLSA Scheduling Order and management of the deadlines set forth therein. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/30/2024. (MEH)
April 30, 2024 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Joint Motion for Case Management Conference Before the Assigned Magistrate Judge by Gregory Servello, Servello & Son, Inc.. (Ortiz, Kelsey)
April 30, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Gregory Servello, Servello & Son, Inc. Related case(s): Yes (Ortiz, Kelsey) Modified text on 5/1/2024 (AA).
April 30, 2024 Filing 10 Defendants, Servello & Son, Inc. and Gregory Servello's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Gregory Servello, Servello & Son, Inc..(Ortiz, Kelsey)
April 29, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Anthony M. Georges-Pierre on behalf of Katiria Longra Perez. Lead Counsel: Anthony M. Georges-Pierre. (Georges-Pierre, Anthony)
April 24, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Order Referring Case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for IDEAL Program. See attached Order for important deadlines and information about the IDEAL Program. (LDJ)
April 24, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Anthony M. Georges-Pierre, Jorge Costa, Santiago Lavandera of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (EVK)
April 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/24/2024. (MEH)
April 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/24/2024. (MEH)
April 23, 2024 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway. New case number: 6:24-cv-757-CEM-RMN. (RPB)
April 23, 2024 Filing 3 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Gregory Servello, Servello & Son, Inc.. (Ortiz, Kelsey)
April 23, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Kristyne E. Kennedy on behalf of Gregory Servello, Servello & Son, Inc.. Lead Counsel: Kristyne E. Kennedy. (Kennedy, Kristyne)
April 23, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Volusia County Circuit Court, case number 2023-31846-CICI filed in State Court on 05/04/2023. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-22014396 filed by Servello & Son, Inc., Gregory Servello. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kennedy, Kristyne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Longra Perez v. Servello & Son, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katiria Longra Perez
Represented By: Santiago Lavandera
Represented By: Anthony M. Georges-Pierre
Represented By: Jorge Costa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Servello & Son, Inc.
Represented By: Kelsey Nicole Ortiz
Represented By: Kristyne E. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Servello
Represented By: Kelsey Nicole Ortiz
Represented By: Kristyne E. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?