Anchorage Yacht Basin, Inc.
Petitioner: Anchorage Yacht Basin, Inc
Respondent: Estate of Perez
Counter-Claimant: Michael N. Millimaci and Stone Sparkes
Claimant: Michael N. Millimaci and Stone Sparkes
Counter-Defendant: Anchorage Yacht Basin, Inc
Unknown: Anchorage Yacht Basin, Inc. as owner of 2000 20 Foot Hurricane Fundeck GS201 Motor Vessel Bearing Hull Identification Number GDYS4511E000 and Florida Registration FL9583J Together with its Engine etc.
Case Number: 6:2024cv01305
Filed: July 18, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Daniel C Irick
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2024 Filing 19 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Anchorage Yacht Basin, Inc by Stone Sparkes.(Gambach, David)
September 13, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by David Neal Gambach on behalf of Stone Sparkes (Gambach, David)
September 13, 2024 Filing 17 Respondent/Claimant's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand (and claim) by Estate of Perez.(Pope, David)
September 13, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Appearance by David F. Pope on behalf of Estate of Perez (Pope, David)
September 13, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by David F. Pope on behalf of Estate of Perez (Pope, David)
September 13, 2024 Filing 14 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Anchorage Yacht Basin, Inc by Michael N. Millimaci.(Kelley, Allan)
September 6, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing Affidavit of Publication by Anchorage Yacht Basin, Inc (Rohr, Dante) Modified text on 9/9/2024 (BD).
August 22, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Allan R. Kelley on behalf of Michael N. Millimaci (Kelley, Allan)
July 29, 2024 Filing 11 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Anchorage Yacht Basin, Inc. as owner of 2000 20 Foot Hurricane Fundeck GS201 Motor Vessel Bearing Hull Identification Number GDYS4511E000 and Florida Registration FL9583J Together with its Engine etc. (Rohr, Dante) Modified on 7/31/2024 to edit docket text (CRB).
July 29, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Anchorage Yacht Basin, Inc. Related case(s): No (Rohr, Dante) Modified text on 7/30/2024 (KME).
July 29, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Dante Christian Rohr on behalf of Anchorage Yacht Basin, Inc. Lead Counsel: Dante C. Rohr, Esq. (Rohr, Dante) Modified text on 7/30/2024 (KME).
July 24, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE OF MONITION AND INJUNCTION. (See #7.) Signed by Judge Julie S. Sneed on 7/24/2024. (AJL) (GNB).
July 24, 2024 Filing 7 MONITION AND INJUNCTION. (See #5 and #6.) Signed by Judge Julie S. Sneed on 7/24/2024. (AJL)
July 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion. Signed by Judge Julie S. Sneed on 7/24/2024. (AJL)
July 19, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay , MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to Approve Ad Interim Stipulation and for Monition and Injunction, and to Approve the Notice of Monition and Injunction by Anchorage Yacht Basin, Inc. as owner of 2000 20 Foot Hurricane Fundeck GS201 Motor Vessel Bearing Hull Identification Number GDYS4511E000 and Florida Registration FL9583J Together with its Engine etc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Monition and Injunction, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Notice of Monition and Injunction, #3 Exhibit Order Approving Ad Interim Stipulation of Value, etc.)(Rohr, Dante)
July 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Julie S. Sneed on 7/19/2024. (GNB)
July 18, 2024 Filing 3 STIPULATION by Anchorage Yacht Basin, Inc. for costs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Appraisal)(Rohr, Dante) Modified on 7/19/2024 as to docket text (ARL).
July 18, 2024 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Julie S. Sneed and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:24-cv-01305-JSS-DCI. (JOS)
July 18, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability against Anchorage Yacht Basin, Inc. (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22310527) filed by Anchorage Yacht Basin Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rohr, Dante) Modified on 7/19/2024 as to docket text (ARL).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anchorage Yacht Basin, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Michael N. Millimaci
Represented By: Allan R. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Stone Sparkes
Represented By: David Neal Gambach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Michael N. Millimaci
Represented By: Allan R. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Stone Sparkes
Represented By: David Neal Gambach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Estate of Perez
Represented By: David F. Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anchorage Yacht Basin, Inc
Represented By: Dante Christian Rohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Anchorage Yacht Basin, Inc
Represented By: Dante Christian Rohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Anchorage Yacht Basin, Inc. as owner of 2000 20 Foot Hurricane Fundeck GS201 Motor Vessel Bearing Hull Identification Number GDYS4511E000 and Florida Registration FL9583J Together with its Engine etc.
Represented By: Dante Christian Rohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?