Toutman v. Cook Incoporated et al
Plaintiff: Jetta Toutman
Defendant: Cook Medical LLC, Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incoporated and Cook Medical Incorporated
Case Number: 6:2024cv02155
Filed: November 25, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Embry J Kidd
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2024 Filing 12 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: Southern District of Indiana. MDL case number: 2570. (RPB)
December 23, 2024 Acknowledgment - Transferred case has been opened in the Southern District of Indiana as case 1:24-cv-07122, filed on 12/23/2024. (CTR)
December 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER to show cause as to Jetta Toutman. Plaintiff has failed to comply with the Court's Order of November 26, 2024 directing counsel to file a Notice of Pendency of Other Actions and a Certificate of Interested Persons. Therefore, it is ORDERED that Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE and file a response to said Order within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of the case without further notice or other appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 12/18/2024. (KM)
December 3, 2024 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on 12/02/2024 by Jetta Toutman as to Cook Medical LLC. (Sanders, Daniel)
December 3, 2024 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 12/02/2024 by Jetta Toutman as to Cook Medical Incorporated. (Sanders, Daniel)
December 3, 2024 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 12/02/2024 by Jetta Toutman as to Cook Incoporated. (Sanders, Daniel)
December 3, 2024 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 12/02/2024 by Jetta Toutman as to Cook Group Incorporated. (Sanders, Daniel)
November 27, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Medical LLC. (MCB)
November 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 11/27/2024. (JOR)
November 26, 2024 Filing 4 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Jetta Toutman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Sanders, Daniel)
November 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL CASE ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 11/26/2024. (KM)
November 26, 2024 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:24-cv-2155-PGB-EJK. (AA)
November 25, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22758291) filed by Jetta Toutman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons)(Sanders, Daniel)(Counsel notified of incomplete summons) Modified on 11/26/2024 (RLK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Toutman v. Cook Incoporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Group Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Incoporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jetta Toutman
Represented By: Daniel Robert Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?