Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC et al v. Wesley Financial Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC and Diamond Resorts Management, Inc.
Defendant: Wesley Financial Group, LLC and Charles William McDowell, III
Petitioner: American Resort Development Association
Case Number: 6:2024mc00008
Filed: March 11, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Embry J Kidd
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE by American Resort Development Association re #1 Motion to Quash (Attachments: #1 Memorandum and Order)(Cravatta, Katlin)
April 11, 2024 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1 Motion to Quash or for Protective Order or to Stay Subpoena for Corporate Representative Deposition filed by American Resort Development Association. (Cravatta, Katlin)
April 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part #8 Non-Party American Resort Development Associations Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Quash or For Protective Order or To Stay Subpoena for Corporate Representative Deposition. Non-Party American Resort Development Associations may file a reply brief, not to exceed five pages, on or before April 11, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 4/4/2024. (ADH)
April 1, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of supplemental authority by Charles William McDowell, III, Wesley Financial Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bennett, John)
April 1, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Motion to Quash or for Protective Order or to Stay Subpoena by American Resort Development Association. (Cravatta, Katlin) Modified on 4/2/2024 to edit text (ELM).
March 25, 2024 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #1 Motion to Quash filed by Charles William McDowell, III, Wesley Financial Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Mascia, Paul)
March 19, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by John Joseph Bennett on behalf of Charles William McDowell, III, Wesley Financial Group, LLC. Lead Counsel: John J. Bennett. (Bennett, John)
March 15, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL John Joseph Bennett, Paul Nicholas Mascia of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (EAM)
March 14, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John Joseph Bennett on behalf of Charles William McDowell, III, Wesley Financial Group, LLC (Bennett, John)
March 14, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Nicholas Mascia on behalf of Charles William McDowell, III, Wesley Financial Group, LLC (Mascia, Paul)
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ENDORSED ORDER taking under advisement #1 Motion to Quash or for Protective Order. The deposition is stayed pending resolution of the Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 3/13/2024. (Kidd, Embry)
March 12, 2024 FEE PAID. Filing fee for new miscellaneous case, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21861948 for $52 paid. (Cravatta, Katlin)
March 11, 2024 Filing 1 MOTION to Quash or for Protective Order or to Stay Subpoena for Corporate Representative Deposition filed by American Resort Development Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cravatta, Katlin) (Modified on 3/12/2024, chambers notified) (BGR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC et al v. Wesley Financial Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diamond Resorts Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesley Financial Group, LLC
Represented By: Paul Nicholas Mascia
Represented By: John Joseph Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles William McDowell, III
Represented By: John Joseph Bennett
Represented By: Paul Nicholas Mascia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: American Resort Development Association
Represented By: Katlin C. Cravatta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?