Martins Pereira v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: Filipe Garcia Martins Pereira
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security and United States Customs and Border Protection
Case Number: 6:2025cv00104
Filed: January 23, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Gregory A Presnell
Referring Judge: Leslie Hoffman Price
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2025 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of service by Filipe Garcia Martins Pereira . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Pendency of Other Actions)(Torrao, Raul)
March 4, 2025 Filing 14 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security. Related case(s): No (Warner, Joy)
March 3, 2025 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Warner, Joy)
March 3, 2025 Filing 12 NOTICE by United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security Notice of Pendency of Other Actions (Warner, Joy) (Note: Counsel notified to resubmit.) Modified text on 3/4/2025 (AA).
March 3, 2025 Filing 11 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security.(Warner, Joy)
January 31, 2025 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested Persons Order by Filipe Garcia Martins Pereira. (Torrao, Raul)
January 31, 2025 Filing 9 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Filipe Garcia Martins Pereira. Related case(s): No (Torrao, Raul)
January 31, 2025 Filing 8 **COUNSEL NOTIFIED TO REFILE USING CORRECT EVENT** CERTIFICATE of service by Filipe Garcia Martins Pereira Of Summons. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Mailing)(Torrao, Raul) Modified on 2/3/2025 as to docket text (ARL).
January 28, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL CASE ORDER - Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement and notice of pendency of other actions due within 14 days. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 1/28/2025. (AKC)
January 28, 2025 Filing 6 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Raul Torrao on behalf of Filipe Garcia Martins Pereira. Lead Counsel: Raul Torrao. (Torrao, Raul)
January 27, 2025 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security. (GL)
January 27, 2025 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Raul Torrao of Local Rule 2.01(b)(2)(B), which requires members of the Middle District bar to maintain with the clerk a current telephone number, mailing address, and email address. Update your contact information for the Middle District through PACER. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GL)
January 27, 2025 Filing 3 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GL)
January 24, 2025 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Gregory A. Presnell and Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. New case number: 6:25-cv-104-GAP-LHP. (AA)
January 23, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Department of Homeland Security and United States Customs and Border Protection (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22944111) filed by Filipe Garcia Martins Pereira. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - FOIA request (CBP-FO-2024-087772), #2 Exhibit 2 - FOIA request (CBP-FO-2024-122163), #3 Exhibit 3 - CBP's webpage, #4 Exhibit 4 - CBP's Fact Sheet on I-94 automation, #5 Exhibit 5 - request to DHS TRIP (case no. 00562032 / Redress Control Number 4051884), #6 Exhibit 6 - DHS TRIP response email December 18, 2024, #7 Exhibit 7 - DHS TRIP response letter July 31, 2024, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Proposed Summons - United States Department of Homeland Security, #10 Proposed Summons - United States Customs and Border Protection)(Torrao, Raul) Modified text on 1/27/2025 (GL).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martins Pereira v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Filipe Garcia Martins Pereira
Represented By: Raul Torrao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Joy Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: Joy Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?