Taveras et al v. SFR Investments V Reit et al
Plaintiff: Eliezer Taveras and Valeria Rosa Taveras
Defendant: SFR Investments V Reit, Altisource Residential Corporation, Front Yard Residential Corporation, Midway Acquistionco Reit, Christiana Trust, Servis One, Inc. doing business as BSI Financial Services, Fay Servicing, LLC, U.S. Bank and Jose Marrero
Case Number: 6:2025cv00262
Filed: February 18, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robert M Norway
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. § 1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2025 Filing 16 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RPB)
March 28, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER dismissing case. This case is DISMISSED without prejudice under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1) based on #14 Plaintiffs' notice of voluntary dismissal. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate any pending motions and deadlines and to close this case. Signed by Judge Julie S. Sneed on 3/28/2025. (AJL)
March 13, 2025 Filing 14 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Eliezer Taveras, Valeria Rosa Taveras. (e-portal) (JOS)
March 12, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Eliezer Taveras, Valeria Rosa Taveras. Plaintiffs have failed to comply with the court's Order #3. Plaintiffs shall SHOW CAUSE and file a response to said Order within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of the case without further notice. Signed by Judge Julie S. Sneed on 3/12/2025. (GNB)
March 12, 2025 Filing 12 NOTICE to the Court by Eliezer Taveras, Valeria Rosa Taveras (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(JOS) (e-portal)
March 7, 2025 Filing 11 SUMMONS issued as to Jose Marrero. (EVK)
March 7, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #8 Motion for Issuance of Summons. The Clerk is DIRECTED to sign, seal, and issue the [8-1] Alias Summons to Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 3/7/2025. (MLS)
March 6, 2025 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Alexander Diaz on behalf of Fay Servicing, LLC, U.S. Bank (Diaz, Adam)
March 6, 2025 Filing 8 MOTION for Issuance of Summons by Eliezer Taveras, Valeria Rosa Taveras. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(JOS) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway. (e-portal)
February 20, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #5 Motion for Authorization to Receive Electronic Service of Documents. Plaintiffs are hereby authorized to receive electronic notification of filings. The Clerk is DIRECTED to add Plaintiffs' email address, etaveras2020@gmail.com, to CM/ECF in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 2/20/2025. (MLS)
February 19, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER denying #2 Plaintiffs' motion for temporary restraining order. Although Middle District of Florida Local Rule 6.01(a)(4) requires a motion for a temporary restraining order to include a precise and verified explanation of the amount and form of the security required under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(c), Plaintiffs' motion does not discuss the security requirement. After Plaintiffs comply with the service requirements in Local Rule 6.01(c) with respect to this order, they may file another motion for temporary restraining order that fully complies with Local Rule 6.01 and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65. The proposed order included with such motion under Local Rule 6.01(a)(6) shall comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65, for example by stating why the order was issued without notice. Signed by Judge Julie S. Sneed on 2/19/2025. (AJL)
February 19, 2025 Filing 5 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically for Authorization to Receive Electronic Service of Documents by Eliezer Taveras, Valeria Rosa Taveras. (JOS) (e-portal)
February 19, 2025 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Christiana Trust, Fay Servicing, LLC, Jose Marrero, SFR Investments V Reit, Servis One, Inc., U.S. Bank. (JOS) (e-portal)
February 19, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Julie S. Sneed on 2/19/2025. (GNB)
February 19, 2025 FEES Paid by All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $405.00, Receipt Number ORL No. 114302). (MLB)
February 18, 2025 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Be Issued by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(e-portal)(chambers notified)(ARL)
February 18, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Tab 1, #3 Tab 2, #4 Tab 3, #5 Tab 4, #6 Tab 5, #7 Tab 6, #8 Tab 7, #9 Tab 8, #10 Tab 9, #11 Tab 10, #12 Civil Cover Sheet) (e-portal)(ARL) Modified on 2/19/2025 to edit the docket text (MLB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taveras et al v. SFR Investments V Reit et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments V Reit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altisource Residential Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Front Yard Residential Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midway Acquistionco Reit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christiana Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Servis One, Inc. doing business as BSI Financial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fay Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Adam Alexander Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank
Represented By: Adam Alexander Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Marrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eliezer Taveras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valeria Rosa Taveras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?