Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc. v. The Unidentified, Shipwrecked Vessel or Vessels Featured Case

Admiralty in rem action over a shipwrecked vessel believed to be a merchant ship lying 100 meters deep, beyond the territorial waters or contiguous zone of any sovereign nation, and approximately 40 miles from Lands End near the English Channel.

Plaintiff: Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.
Defendant: The Unidentified, Shipwrecked Vessel or Vessels
Claimant: Kingdom of Spain
Intervenor Plaintiff: Keith Bray
Case Number: 8:2006cv01685
Filed: September 13, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Tampa Office
County: Hillsborough
Presiding Judge: Thomas B. McCoun
Presiding Judge: Steven D. Merryday
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2010 ACKNOWLEDGMENT by USCA of receiving appeal fees received $455 receipt number T057225 on 09/24/10 re 189 Notice of appeal. (JMS)
September 24, 2010 Filing 190 TRANSCRIPT information form filed by Keith Bray re 189 Notice of appeal. USCA number: 10-14396. (Majewski, Annabel)
September 21, 2010 TRANSMITTAL to USCA forwarding Appeal filing fee of $455.00 was paid. Receipt # T057225 re 189 Notice of appeal (JMS)
September 20, 2010 USCA appeal fees received $ 455 receipt number T057225 re 189 Notice of appeal filed by Keith Bray (ARC)
September 17, 2010 TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of certified copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re 189 Notice of appeal. Eleventh Circuit Transcript information form available to counsel at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under Forms and Publications/General. Notice of Appearance (JMS)
September 16, 2010 Filing 189 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 187 Order on motion for reconsideration, 185 Order by Keith Bray. (Filing fee not paid) (Wasson, Roy)
September 16, 2010 Filing 188 NOTICE of Appearance by Roy D. Wasson on behalf of Keith Bray (Wasson, Roy)
August 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER denying 186 --motion for reconsideration re 185 --order. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 8/31/2010. (BK)
August 30, 2010 Filing 186 MOTION for reconsideration re 185 Order by Keith Bray. (Butler, Frank)
August 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER dismissing without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction 74 --intervenor's complaint; directing the Clerk to TERMINATE any pending motion and CLOSE the case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 8/18/2010. (BK)
August 18, 2010 Filing 184 MOTION for leave to file Instanter Brief to the Court's Show Cause Order by Keith Bray. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Butler, Frank)
August 17, 2010 Filing 183 AFFIDAVIT of Keith Bray re: 181 Response to order to show cause by Keith Bray. (Butler, Frank)
August 16, 2010 Filing 182 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 178 OrderOrder to show cause by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
August 9, 2010 Filing 181 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 178 OrderOrder to show cause filed by Keith Bray. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Butler, Frank)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ENDORSED ORDER granting 179 Unopposed Motion for extension of time to respond to the Court's show cause Order. Bray's response to the Court's show cause Order is due on or before August 9, 2010, and Odyssey's response thereto is due within five days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 7/30/2010. (AGG)
July 28, 2010 Filing 179 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to 178 OrderOrder to show cause by Keith Bray. (Butler, Frank) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Keith Bray as to why his case should not be dismissed for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. (Show Cause Response due by 7/30/2010.) See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 7/20/2010. (AGG)
July 20, 2010 Filing 177 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo: FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 7/20/2010. (DIGITAL) (AGG)
July 19, 2010 Filing 176 PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Keith Bray. (Butler, Frank)
July 19, 2010 Filing 175 PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
July 9, 2010 Filing 174 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The pretrial conference hearing previously scheduled for July 20, 2010 at 10:00 a.m.is rescheduled. New scheduling date and time: Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/20/2010 at 03:00 PM in Tampa Courtroom 11 B before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo (DK)
June 17, 2010 Filing 173 MEDIATION REPORT Hearing held on June 17, 2010 Hearing outcome: impasse(Munch, Jacob)
May 10, 2010 Filing 172 NOTICE of mediation hearing to be held on June 17, 2010 2:00 p.m. before Jacob Munch. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER striking 170 --notice of unavailability by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 4/15/2010. (BK)
April 13, 2010 Filing 170 **NOTE: DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER 171 ORDER DATED 4/15/2010** NOTICE of unavailability of counsel byOdyssey Marine Exploration, Inc. from May 13, 2010 to May 21, 2010. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen) Modified on 4/16/2010 (CH).
March 29, 2010 Filing 169 NOTICE of unavailability of counsel byKeith Bray from July 5, 2010 to July 11, 2010. (Butler, Frank)
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ENDORSED ORDER granting 167 --motion by intervenor, Keith Bray, to extend to 3/27/2010 the time within which to respond to discovery requests. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 3/24/2010. (BK)
March 17, 2010 Filing 167 MOTION to extend time to March 27, 2010 to Respond to Discovery by Keith Bray. (Butler, Frank)
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER adopting 165 --REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; granting 156 --motion for partial summary judgment by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.; vacating 7 --warrant of arrest; directing the Clerk to CLOSE the in rem action. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 2/1/2010. (BK)
January 5, 2010 Filing 165 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 156 MOTION for partial summary judgment filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 1/5/2010. (AGG)
December 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 164 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 4/1/2010, Discovery due by 8/1/2010, Dispositive motions due by 6/15/2010, Pretrial Conference set for 7/20/2010 at 10:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 11 B before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo, Bench Trial set for the trial term commencing 8/2/2010 in Tampa Courtroom 15 A before Judge Steven D. Merryday. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 12/28/2009. (TKD)
December 22, 2009 Filing 163 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Butler, Frank)
December 22, 2009 Filing 162 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Sandra K. Lee (SL)
December 22, 2009 Filing 161 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on 11/09/09 before Judge Mark A. Pizzo. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sandra K. Lee,Telephone number 813/301-5699. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 1/12/2010, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/22/2010, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/22/2010. (SL)
November 24, 2009 Filing 160 RESPONSE to motion re 156 MOTION for partial summary judgment filed by Keith Bray. (Butler, Frank)
November 16, 2009 Filing 159 RESPONSE re 157 Minute entry Court Requested Letter Memorandum of Law filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER referring to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo for a report and recommendation: 156 --motion by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc., for partial summary judgment. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 11/12/2009. (BK)
November 9, 2009 Filing 157 Minute Entry. Status conference held before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo: on 11/9/2009. (DIGITAL) Court Reporter: Sandra K. Lee (AGG)
November 6, 2009 Filing 156 MOTION for partial summary judgment by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit)(Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
November 6, 2009 Filing 155 STATUS REPORT re Unidentified Shipwreck by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
June 28, 2009 Filing 154 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Sandra K. Lee (SL)
June 28, 2009 Filing 153 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference and Motion to Bifurcate held on 06/23/09 before Judge Mark A., Pizzo. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sandra K. Lee,Telephone number 813/301-5699. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 7/20/2009, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/29/2009, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/28/2009. (SL)
June 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER denying without prejudice 145 Motion to bifurcate. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 6/23/2009. (AGG)
June 23, 2009 Filing 151 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 11/9/2009 at 01:30 PM in Tampa Courtroom 11 B before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo. (AGG)
June 23, 2009 Filing 150 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo: on 6/23/2009. (digital) Court Reporter: Sandra K. Lee (AGG)
June 23, 2009 Filing 149 NOTICE of Appearance by David F. Pope on behalf of Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc. (Pope, David)
June 10, 2009 Filing 148 NOTICE of Hearing: Hearing on Plaintiff's motion to bifurcate (doc. 145)and Status Conference scheduled for June 23, 2009, at 2:00 pm. See Notice for details. (AGG)
May 4, 2009 Filing 147 RESPONSE to motion re 145 MOTION to bifurcate Claims of Spain from Claim of Claimant, Keith Bray filed by Keith Bray. (Butler, Frank)
May 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER referring to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo for disposition: 145 --motion by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc., to bifurcate claims of Spain from claim of Keith Bray. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 5/1/2009. (BK)
April 20, 2009 Filing 145 MOTION to bifurcate Claims of Spain from Claim of Claimant, Keith Bray by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
January 8, 2009 Filing 144 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo: on 1/8/2009. (DIGITAL) Court Reporter: Linda Starr (AGG)
November 26, 2008 Filing 143 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 1/8/2009 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11 B before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo. Pre-trial conference scheduled for 12/1/08 is cancelled.(AGG)
November 26, 2008 Filing 142 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo: on 11/26/2008. (DIGITAL) (AGG)
November 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER denying 139 Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.'s Motion for reconsideration re 134 Order on motion to compel and 124 Order on motion to compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 11/6/2008. (AGG)
November 6, 2008 Filing 140 RESPONSE to motion re 139 MOTION for reconsideration re 134 Order on motion to compel, 124 Order on motion to compel filed by Kingdom of Spain. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Goold, James)
November 5, 2008 Filing 139 MOTION for reconsideration re 134 Order on motion to compel, 124 Order on motion to compel by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Thiel, Eric)
November 5, 2008 Filing 138 NOTICE of change of address by Eric Christopher Thiel (Thiel, Eric)
November 4, 2008 Filing 137 MOTION for reconsideration re 134 Order on motion to compel, 124 Order on motion to compel by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Von Spiegelfeld, Allen) ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE DOES NOT MATCH LOGIN USED, COUNSEL INSTRUCTED TO REFILE. Modified on 11/5/2008 (RFM).
November 4, 2008 Filing 136 NOTICE by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc. Concerning Counsel (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen) WRONG EVENT USED, COUNSEL TO REFILE. Modified on 11/5/2008 (RFM).
October 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER denying 128 Intervenor Keith Bray's motion to extend discovery deadlines. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 10/31/2008. (AGG)
October 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting 129 Kingdom of Spain's motion to compel compliance with court order directing compliance with Rule 34 request and for Rule 37 sanctions. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 10/31/2008. (AGG)
October 30, 2008 Filing 133 MEMORANDUM in opposition re 129 Motion to compel Compliance with Court Order and for Rule 37 Sanctions filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
October 29, 2008 Filing 132 RESPONSE to motion re 128 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
October 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER denying without prejudice 125 --the plaintiff's motion for a preliminary pretrial conference. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 10/27/2008. (BK)
October 24, 2008 Filing 130 RESPONSE to motion re 128 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Deadlines filed by Kingdom of Spain. (Goold, James)
October 24, 2008 Filing 129 MOTION to compel compliance with Court Order directing compliance with Rule 34 request and for Rule 37 sanctions by Kingdom of Spain. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Goold, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
October 23, 2008 Filing 128 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Keith Bray. (Butler, Frank) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
October 20, 2008 Filing 127 MEMORANDUM in opposition re 125 Motion for miscellaneous relief filed by Kingdom of Spain. (Goold, James)
October 20, 2008 Filing 126 RESPONSE to motion re 125 MOTION for Preliminary Pretrial Conference filed by Keith Bray. (Butler, Frank)
October 17, 2008 Filing 125 MOTION for Preliminary Pretrial Conference by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
October 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting 121 Kingdom of Spain's Motion to compel compliance with Rule 34 request for production of documents. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 10/16/2008. (AGG)
October 14, 2008 Filing 123 MEMORANDUM in opposition re 121 Motion to compel Compliance with Rule 34 Request for Production of Documents filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
October 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER that Odyssey's response to 121 Kingdom of Spain motion to compel compliance with Rule 34 request for production of documents is due on or before October 14, 2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 10/9/2008. (AGG)
October 7, 2008 Filing 121 MOTION to compel compliance with Rule 34 request by Kingdom of Spain. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Goold, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
June 23, 2008 Filing 120 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Dennis Miracle (DM)
June 23, 2008 Filing 119 TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 6/9/08 before Judge Mark A. Pizzo. Court Reporter/Transcriber Dennis Miracle,Telephone number 352/369-7401. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 7/14/2008, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/24/2008, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/22/2008. (DM)
June 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 118 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery completed by 10/23/2008, Dispositive motions due by 11/3/2008, Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/1/2008 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11B before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo, Bench Trial set for trial term commencing 1/5/09 in Courtroom 15A before Judge Steven D. Merryday. Other deadlines specified in the order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 6/11/2008. (MTT)
June 9, 2008 Filing 117 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo: PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 6/9/2008. (digital) (MTT)
May 28, 2008 Filing 116 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16(a) Pretrial Conference set for 6/9/2008 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11 B before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo. (MTT)
May 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER denying without prejudice 94 Motion to compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 5/12/2008. (MTT)
May 8, 2008 Filing 114 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: 99 Order on motion to compelOrder on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Kingdom of Spain. (Goold, James)
April 28, 2008 Filing 113 NOTICE of unavailability of counsel byKeith Bray from June 16, 2008 to June 27, 2008. (Butler, Frank)
April 28, 2008 Filing 112 RECEIPT for return of exhibits and/or exhibit substitutes as to Kingdom of Spain (AG)
April 17, 2008 Filing 111 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: 99 Order by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc. (RFM)
April 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER denying 105 Motion for protective order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 4/17/2008. (MTT)
April 17, 2008 Filing 109 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo: Telephone Conference held on 4/17/2008. (DIGITAL) (MTT)
April 15, 2008 Filing 108 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 3/5/08 before Judge Mark A. Pizzo. Court Reporter: Sherrill L. Jackson. (RFM)
April 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting 103 motion to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 4/15/2008. (MTT)
April 14, 2008 Filing 106 RESPONSE to motion re 105 MOTION for protective order (Expedited) filed by Kingdom of Spain. (Attachments: # 1 English Translation of Article, # 2 Spanish Version of Article)(Banker, David)
April 11, 2008 Sealed document S-2. (RFM) UNSEALED PURSUANT TO 110 ORDER ENTERED 4/17/08. Modified on 4/18/2008 (RFM).
April 11, 2008 Filing 105 MOTION for protective order by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
April 3, 2008 Filing 104 AFFIDAVIT of K. Russell LaMotte re: 103 Unopposed MOTION for K. Russell LaMotte to appear pro hac vice by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
April 3, 2008 Filing 103 Unopposed MOTION for K. Russell LaMotte to appear pro hac vice by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Von Spiegelfeld, Allen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
April 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER denying without prejudice 100 Motion to conduct hearing in camera. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 4/2/2008. (MTT)
April 2, 2008 Filing 101 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo: Telephone Conference held on 4/2/2008. (DIGITAL) (MTT)
March 31, 2008 Filing 100 MOTION to Conduct Hearing In Camera by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
March 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 84 Motion to compel; granting in part and denying in part 85 Motion for an Order declaring Certain Materials as not confidential. The Clerk is directed to return to Spain the items filed by Spain under seal as attachments to its motion for leave to file under seal (doc. 92). The parties are directed to answer the Court interrogatories as directed in the Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 3/12/2008. (DK)
March 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 46 --motion to dismiss. Counts 3-5 are dismissed. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 3/6/2008. (BK)
March 5, 2008 Filing 97 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo: PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 3/5/2008. Court Reporter: Sherrill L. Jackson (MTT)
March 4, 2008 Filing 96 RESPONSE to motion re 94 Supplemental MOTION to compel compliance with disclosure order relating to photographs and videotapes filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Composite Exhibit A)(Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
March 4, 2008 Filing 95 RESPONSE to motion re 92 MOTION for leave to file under seal filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
March 3, 2008 Sealed document S-1 (AG)***DOCUMENTS RETURNED TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S 99 ORDER*** Modified on 3/12/2008 (AG).
March 3, 2008 Filing 94 Supplemental MOTION to compel compliance with disclosure order relating to photographs and videotapes by Kingdom of Spain. (Goold, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
March 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER denying 89 Motion to conduct the March 5, 2008 hearing in camera; granting 92 Motion for leave to file under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 3/3/2008. (MTT)
February 28, 2008 Filing 92 MOTION for leave to file under seal by Kingdom of Spain. (AG)
February 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER ruling deferred 85 Motion seeking an order finding certain materials disclosed to Spain by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc. are not confidential. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 2/22/2008. (DK)
February 20, 2008 Filing 90 RESPONSE in opposition re 89 MOTION to Conduct March 5 Hearing In Camera filed by Kingdom of Spain. (Goold, James)
February 19, 2008 Filing 89 MOTION to Conduct March 5 Hearing In Camera by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
February 8, 2008 Filing 88 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
February 8, 2008 Filing 87 RESPONSE to motion re 85 MOTION to declare certain materials as not confidential under the protective order filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
February 8, 2008 Filing 86 RESPONSE to motion re 84 MOTION to compel compliance with disclosure order and for other relief filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
February 1, 2008 Filing 85 MOTION to declare certain materials as not confidential under the protective order by Kingdom of Spain. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Goold, James)
February 1, 2008 Filing 84 MOTION to compel compliance with disclosure order and for other relief by Kingdom of Spain. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Goold, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
January 25, 2008 Filing 83 TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 1/10/08 before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo. Court Reporter: Sandra K. Lee. (RFM)
January 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 82 PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING DISCLOSURE OF CERTAIN INFORMATION Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 1/10/2008. (DK)
January 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 38 Motion for protective order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 1/10/2008. (DK)
January 10, 2008 Filing 80 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo: PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 1/10/2008. Court Reporter: Sandra K. Lee (DK)
January 9, 2008 Filing 79 ANSWER to 74 Intervenor Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Research Agreement)(Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
January 9, 2008 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Dennis Skorewicz on behalf of Kingdom of Spain (Skorewicz, Keith)
January 9, 2008 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Carter Andersen on behalf of Kingdom of Spain (Andersen, Jeffrey)
December 21, 2007 Filing 76 NOTICE by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc. re 50 Summons issued of Status of Service of Process on Kingdom of Spain (Thiel, Eric)
December 21, 2007 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Melinda Joy MacConnel on behalf of Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc. (MacConnel, Melinda)
December 20, 2007 Filing 74 INTERVENOR'S COMPLAINT filed by Keith Bray.(Butler, Frank)
December 6, 2007 Filing 73 TRANSCRIPT of preliminary pretrial conference held on 11/26/07 before Judge Mark A. Pizzo. Court Reporter: Dennis Miracle. (DG)
December 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting 58 Motion to intervene. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 12/3/2007. (MTT)
November 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER setting forth procedures for identical or parallel filings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 11/28/2007. (MTT)
November 26, 2007 Filing 70 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo: PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 11/26/2007. (MTT)
November 19, 2007 Filing 69 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: 65 Order setting preliminary pretrial by Kingdom of Spain. (Goold, James)
November 13, 2007 Filing 68 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: 65 Order setting preliminary pretrial by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
November 7, 2007 Filing 67 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc. re 65 Order setting preliminary pretrial (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
November 5, 2007 Filing 66 REPLY to response to motion re 46 MOTION to dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and for Other Relief filed by Kingdom of Spain. (Goold, James)
November 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER setting preliminary pretrial. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/26/2007 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11 B before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 11/2/2007. (maa)
October 30, 2007 Filing 64 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
October 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ENDORSED ORDER granting 62 --motion by Kingdom of Spain to reply to 59 --plaintiff's opposition to motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 10/26/2007. (BK)
October 25, 2007 Filing 62 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Claimant's Motion to Dismiss by Kingdom of Spain. (Goold, James)
October 22, 2007 Filing 61 REQUEST for oral argument re 38 MOTION for protective order Regarding Preliminary Site Assessment, 46 MOTION to dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and for Other Relief by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
October 22, 2007 Filing 60 REPLY to response to motion re 38 MOTION for protective order Regarding Preliminary Site Assessment filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
October 22, 2007 Filing 59 MEMORANDUM in opposition re 46 Motion to dismiss filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
October 19, 2007 Filing 58 MOTION to intervene and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Keith Bray. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Intervening Complaint)(Butler, Frank) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
October 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting 56 --motion to extend to 10/30/2007 the time within which to file a case management report. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 10/10/2007. (BK)
October 10, 2007 Filing 56 Third MOTION to extend time to File Completed Case Management Report (Joint Motion) by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
October 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ENDORSED ORDER granting 52 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Reply due 10/22/2007. Signed by Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 10/9/2007. (MTT)
October 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ENDORSED ORDER granting 53 --motion to extend time within which to respond to 46 --motion to dismiss amended complaint. Response due 10/22/2007. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 10/4/2007. (BK)
October 3, 2007 Filing 53 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 46 MOTION to dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and for Other Relief by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Thiel, Eric) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
October 3, 2007 Filing 52 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 47 Memorandum in opposition to Motion for Protective Order by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Thiel, Eric) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
September 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ENDORSED ORDER granting 49 --Odyssey's motion for leave to file a five-page reply to 47 --Spain's opposition to 38 --Odyssey's motion for protective order. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 9/28/2007. (BK)
September 27, 2007 Filing 50 Summons issued as to Kingdom of Spain. (RFM)
September 26, 2007 Filing 49 MOTION for leave to file Reply to Claimant Kingdom of Spain's Opposition to Motion for Protective Order by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
September 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER directing the Clerk to designate Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo as the magistrate assigned to this case. NEW CASE NUMBER: 8:06-cv-1685-T-23MAP. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 9/25/2007. (BK)
September 25, 2007 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo. New case number: 8:06-cv-1685-T-23TBM. Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun, III no longer assigned to the case. (RFM)
September 19, 2007 Filing 47 MEMORANDUM in opposition re 38 Motion for protective order filed by Kingdom of Spain. (Goold, James) Modified text on 9/20/2007 (RFM).
September 19, 2007 Filing 46 MOTION to dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and for Other Relief by Kingdom of Spain. (Goold, James)
September 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ENDORSED ORDER granting 44 plaintiff's Second Joint Motion fpr extension of time to file completed case management report. The case management report is due on or before 10/9/2007. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 9/7/2007. (maa)
September 6, 2007 Filing 44 Second Joint MOTION to extend time to File Completed Case Management Report by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen) Modified text on 9/7/2007 (RFM).
August 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting 28 --motion to vacate; denying as moot 28 --motion for more definite statement; vacating 25 --default judgment; granting 40 --motion for extension of time to respond to amended complaint and motion for protective order. By 9/19/2007 the Kingdom of Spain shall respond to 35 (amended complaint) and 38 (motion for protective order). Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 8/17/2007. (BK)
August 16, 2007 Filing 42 NOTICE of withdrawal of motion by Kingdom of Spain to Transfer Related Cases and Notice of Filing of Amended Motion to Transfer (Banker, David)
August 15, 2007 Filing 41 MOTION to transfer case (i.e., related cases under Local Rule 1.04(b)) by Kingdom of Spain. (Goold, James)
August 14, 2007 Filing 40 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 38 MOTION for protective order Regarding Preliminary Site Assessment, 37 Amended complaint of Plaintiff; by Kingdom of Spain. (Goold, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun, III.
August 7, 2007 Filing 39 AFFIDAVIT of Gregory P. Stemm re: 38 MOTION for protective order Regarding Preliminary Site Assessment by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
August 7, 2007 Filing 38 MOTION for protective order Regarding Preliminary Site Assessment by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Von Spiegelfeld, Allen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun, III.
August 7, 2007 Filing 37 AMENDED COMPLAINT against The Unidentified, Shipwrecked Vessel or Vessels filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Sworn Statement of Greg Stemm - Part 1# 2 Sworn Statement of Greg Stemm - Part 2)(Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
August 6, 2007 Filing 36 MOTION for protective order Regarding Preliminary Site Assessment by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Greg Stemm# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Von Spiegelfeld, Allen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun, III.
August 6, 2007 Filing 35 AMENDED COMPLAINT against The Unidentified, Shipwrecked Vessel or Vessels filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Sworn Statement of Greg Stemm - Part 1# 2 Sworn Statement of Greg Stemm - Part 2)(Von Spiegelfeld, Allen) COUNSEL TO REFILE LISTING PARTIES PROPERLY. Modified on 8/7/2007 (RFM).
July 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ENDORSED ORDER granting 33 --motion to extend to 8/6/2007 the time within which to submit a case management report. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 7/30/2007. (BK)
July 27, 2007 Filing 33 Joint MOTION to extend time to File Completed Case Management Report by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
July 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ENDORSED ORDER granting 31 --motion for an enlargement of the time within which to respond to motion for more definite statement, etc. Response due 8/6/2007. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 7/26/2007. (BK)
July 23, 2007 Filing 31 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 28 MOTION to vacate 25 Default judgment MOTION to vacate 25 Default judgment MOTION for more definite statement by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun, III.
June 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ENDORSED ORDER granting 29 --Odyssey's motion to extend to 7/23/2007 the time within which to respond to Doc. 28 . Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 6/28/2007. (BK)
June 26, 2007 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 28 MOTION to vacate 25 Default judgment by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun, III. Modified text on 6/27/2007 (RFM).
June 15, 2007 Filing 28 UNOPPOSED MOTION to vacate 25 Default judgment and deeming the Kingdom of Spain's verified claim as timely submitted, and OPPOSED MOTION for an order requiring plaintiff to provide a more definite statement and access to relevant information before the Kingdom of Spain files its responsive pleading by Kingdom of Spain. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (RFM)
June 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ENDORSED ORDER granting 26 unopposed motion for James A. Goold, Esq., to appear pro hac vice on behalf of the Kingdom of Spain. Signed by Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 6/4/2007. (slb)
June 1, 2007 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for James A. Goold to appear pro hac vice by Kingdom of Spain. (Banker, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun, III.
May 31, 2007 Filing 25 VACATED. See Doc. 43 . DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of plaintiff against The Unidentified, Shipwrecked Vessel or Vessels (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (CH) Modified on 8/17/2007 (BK)
May 30, 2007 Filing 24 VERIFIED CLAIM property by Kingdom of Spain. (Attachments: # 1)(ag)
May 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 22 --motion for default judgment. The Clerk shall ENTER final judgment awarding the plaintiff title to the unidentified shipwrecked vessel, its apparel, tackle, appurtenances, and cargo; TERMINATE any pending motion; and CLOSE the case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 5/30/2007. (BK)
May 15, 2007 Filing 22 MOTION for default judgment against The Unidentified, Shipwrecked Vessel or Vessels by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun, III.
April 6, 2007 Filing 21 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to The Unidentified, Shipwrecked Vessel or Vessels. (RFM)
April 5, 2007 Filing 20 MOTION Request for Entry of Clerk's Default by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Entry of Clerk's Default)(Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
November 1, 2006 BOND paid by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc. in the amount of $5,000.00. Receipt number T039345. (RFM)
October 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION and ORDER adopting 16 --REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; granting 3 --motion for preliminary injunction filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc. Injunction is effective immediately upon the plaintiff's posting with the Clerk a $5,000.00 bond. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 10/30/2006. (BK)
October 13, 2006 Filing 18 PROOF OF PUBLICATION filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. Newspaper: Tampa Tribune Date(s) of publication September 30, 2006. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
October 12, 2006 Filing 17 NOTICE by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc. Filing Affidavit of Publication of Notice of Arrest (Attachments: #(1) Affidavit Publication of Notice of Arrest)(Von Spiegelfeld, Allen) Wrong event used, counsel called and instructed to refile. Modified on 10/13/2006 (RFM).
October 11, 2006 Filing 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc. Signed by Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 10/11/2006. (slb)
October 10, 2006 Filing 15 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Thomas B. McCoun III: Motion Hearing held on 10/10/2006 re 3 MOTION for preliminary injunction filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc. (DIGITAL) (src)
October 6, 2006 Filing 14 NOTICE by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc. re 3 MOTION for preliminary injunction of Filing Affidavit of John Morris (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of John Morris)(Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
October 3, 2006 Filing 13 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Thomas B. McCoun III: Status Conference held on 10/3/2006. (DIGITAL) (src)
October 3, 2006 Filing 12 NOTICE OF HEARING: Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction set for 10/10/2006 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 12 B before Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III. (slb)
September 26, 2006 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Status Conference set for 10/3/2006 at 10:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III. (slb)
September 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER referring motion to Magistrate Judge McCoun for report and recommendation: 3 --plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 9/25/2006. (BK)
September 22, 2006 Filing 9 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 9/22/2006. (maa)
September 20, 2006 Filing 8 US Marshal 285 form for Arrest of vessel. (RFM)
September 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting 2 Motion for issuance of warrant in rem. The clerk is directed to issue a warrant of arrest. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 9/15/2006. (RFM)
September 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting 4 Motion to appoint substitute custodian. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 9/15/2006. (RFM)
September 15, 2006 Filing 4 MOTION to appoint custodian (substitute custodian) by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit # 2 Consent and Indemnification Agreement for Appointment of Substitute Custodian)(Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
September 15, 2006 Filing 3 MOTION for preliminary injunction by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
September 15, 2006 Filing 2 MOTION for issuance of warrant in rem by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Warrant of Arrest In Rem)(Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
September 13, 2006 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Unidentified, Shipwrecked Vessel or Vessels (Filing fee $350 receipt number T038663), filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc. (RFM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc. v. The Unidentified, Shipwrecked Vessel or Vessels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.
Represented By: Allen K. Von Spiegelfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Unidentified, Shipwrecked Vessel or Vessels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Kingdom of Spain
Represented By: Keith Dennis Skorewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Keith Bray
Represented By: Frank D. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?