John and Jane Does v. Thacker et al Featured Case

Pro se complaint that public library is setting unnecessarily short time limits on users of Internet terminals.

Plaintiff: Laura Thacker and John and Jane Does
Defendant: Hillsborough County Library Cooperative and Hillsborough County Library
Case Number: 8:2007cv01778
Filed: September 28, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Tampa Office
County: Hillsborough
Presiding Judge: Susan C Bucklew
Presiding Judge: Mary S. Scriven
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 6
ORDER dismissing this case without prejudice and directing the Clerk to close the case. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 3/25/2008. (JD)
March 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5
ORDER that Plaintiff is directed to show cause by a written response filed on or before 3/24/2008 for failing to perfect service within 120 days after filing the complaint. Failure to respond will result in dismissal of this action without prejudice without further notice. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 3/17/2008. (CM)
October 22, 2007 Filing 4
NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2 with Notice of Expected Deadlines and Case Management Report made a part herein. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 10/22/2007. (ls )
October 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 3
ORDER granting 2 Plaintiff's Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff the appropriate summons forms immediately. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to complete and return those forms to the Clerk within 20 days.. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 10/9/2007. (mst)
September 28, 2007 Filing 2
MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency by Laura Thacker. (mrh) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mary S. Scriven.
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John and Jane Does v. Thacker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Thacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John and Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillsborough County Library Cooperative
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillsborough County Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?