Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc. v. The Unidentified, Wrecked and Abandoned Sailing Vessel Featured Case

Plaintiff Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc. asserts a complaint in rem against a cannon wreck of the Colonial period lying within the English Channel at a depth of less than 200 meters between 25 to 40 miles from the Coast of the United Kingdom.

Plaintiff: Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.
Defendant: The Unidentified, Wrecked and Abandoned Sailing Vessel
Case Number: 8:2008cv01045
Filed: May 29, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Contract: Marine Office
County: Hillsborough
Presiding Judge: Richard A. Lazzara
Presiding Judge: Mark A. Pizzo
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1333 Admiralty
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ENDORSED ORDER granting 27 Motion to dismiss; granting 27 Motion to vacate. This case is dismissed without prejudice. The clerk is directed to term any pending motions/deadlines and to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 9/18/2009. (SKH)
September 17, 2009 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION to dismiss this action without prejudice, Unopposed MOTION to vacate the warrant for arrest by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Nelson, Carl)
July 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ENDORSED ORDER granting 25 Motion to extend time to file verified statement of right or interest by Ministry of Defense, United Kingdom. Deadline extended to 9/29/09. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 7/8/2009. (SKH)
July 8, 2009 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION to extend time to File Verified Statement of Right or Interest by Ministry of Defence, United Kingdom. (Shusta, Timothy)
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ENDORSED ORDER granting 23 Motion to extend time to file verified statement of right of interest by Ministry of Defense, United Kingdom. Deadline extended to 7/9/09. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/8/2009. (SKH)
May 7, 2009 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION to extend time to file Verified Statement of Right or Interest by Ministry of Defence, United Kingdom. (Shusta, Timothy)
May 5, 2009 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Peter Shusta on behalf of Ministry of Defence, United Kingdom (Shusta, Timothy)
April 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ENDORSED ORDER granting 20 Motion to substitute attorney. Carl R. Nelson of Fowler, White Boggs, P.A. is substituted for Allen von Spiegelfeld and Eric C. Thiel of Banker Lopez Gassler, P.A. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/6/2009.(SKH)
April 6, 2009 Filing 20 Joint MOTION to substitute attorney by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Nelson, Carl)
February 23, 2009 Filing 19 PROOF OF PUBLICATION filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. Newspaper: Tampa Tribune and The Times London Date(s) of publication February 11, 2009 and February 12, 2009. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Tampa Tribune Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit London Times Affidavit)(Thiel, Eric)
February 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 17 Motion to approve notice of Action in Rem and Arrest. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 2/4/2009. (MSS)
February 3, 2009 Filing 17 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Approve Notice of Action in Rem and Arrest for Publication by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of Action in Rem and Arrest, # 2 Exhibit B Proposed Order)(Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
December 12, 2008 Filing 16 NOTICE of change of address by Allen K. Von Spiegelfeld (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
October 28, 2008 Sealed document S-2 (LYB)
October 27, 2008 Sealed document S-1 (LYB)
October 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ATTACHED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why case should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution as to Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc. Show Cause Response due on or before 11/1/2008. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 10/21/2008. (CCB)
July 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED ORDER attached appointing substitute custodian (amended for purposes of correcting case style from former entry at docket 10). Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 7/2/2008. (CCB)
July 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER vacating order appointing substitute custodian at docket 10 for sole purpose of correcting case style. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 7/2/2008. (CCB)
June 24, 2008 Filing 12 US Marshal 285 form for ARREST of vessel. (RFM)
June 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER attached denying 9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 6/20/2008. (CCB)
June 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting 6 Motion to appoint substitute custodian. Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc. appointed. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 6/20/2008. (SKH)
June 19, 2008 Filing 9 MOTION for preliminary injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
June 19, 2008 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Melinda J. MacConnel re: 6 MOTION to appoint custodian (Substitute Custodian) by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
June 19, 2008 Filing 7 CONSENT and indemnification agreement for appointment of substitute custodian.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
June 19, 2008 Filing 6 MOTION to appoint custodian (Substitute Custodian) by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
June 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ENDORSED ORDER granting 3 Motion for Order Directing Clerk to Issue Warrant of Arrest in Rem. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 6/18/2008. (SKH)
June 18, 2008 Filing 3 MOTION for issuance of warrant in rem by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
May 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 6/8/2008. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/30/2008. (RJC)
May 29, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Unidentified, Wrecked and Abandoned Sailing Vessel (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number T046246) filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc..(LYB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc. v. The Unidentified, Wrecked and Abandoned Sailing Vessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.
Represented By: Allen K. Von Spiegelfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Unidentified, Wrecked and Abandoned Sailing Vessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?