Langfitt v. Federal Marine Terminals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bruce Langfitt
Defendant: Federal Marine Terminals, Inc. and BBC Chartering USA, LLC
Case Number: 8:2008cv01377
Filed: July 17, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Marine Office
County: Hillsborough
Presiding Judge: James S. Moody
Presiding Judge: Mary S. Scriven
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to enter Judgment in favor of Defendant FEDERAL MARINE TERMINALS, INC. and against Plaintiff BRUCE LANGFITT and Defendant BBC CHARTERING AND LOGISTICS GMBH AND CO. K.G. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 4/7/2010. (LN)
March 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER: The Joint Stipulation for Dismissal of Defendant, BBC Chartering and Logistics GmbH and Co K.G. Only 112 is GRANTED and said Defendant is DISMISSED from this action. Defendant BBC's Motion for Summary Judgment 42 and Defendant BBC's Amended Motion for Leave to File Reply 79 are terminated as moot. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 3/26/2010. (LN)
June 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER: Defendant BBC's Motion to Reconsider Denial of Motion for Leave to File Cross-Claim 37 is GRANTED. This Court's Order entered on 3-3-09 36 is VACATED. Defendant BBC's Second Motion in Support of Leave to File Amended Cross-Claim 45 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 6/1/2009. (LN)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Langfitt v. Federal Marine Terminals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Langfitt
Represented By: Jacob J. Munch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Marine Terminals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BBC Chartering USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?