Mitchell v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Scott G. Mitchell
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 8:2008cv01573
Filed: August 12, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW Office
County: Pasco
Presiding Judge: Virginia M. Hernandez Covington
Presiding Judge: Thomas G. Wilson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 13 Motion for attorney fees. Plaintiff, Scott Mitchell is awarded a total of $2,398.00, comprised of attorneys fees in the amount of $2,048.00 and costs in the amount of $350.00.Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 7/23/2009. (ACD)
March 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 9 motion to remand; adopting 10 report and recommendation. The decision of the Commissioner is REVERSED and REMANDED. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of Scott Mitchell. If Scott Mitchell ultimately prevails in this case upon remand to the Social Security Administration, any motion for attorney's fees under 42 U.S.C. § 406(b) must be filed within 60 days of the Commissioner's final decision. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 3/27/2009. (MTD)
March 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 9 Unopposed MOTION to remand filed by Commissioner of Social Security -- recommend that the motion be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 3/2/2009. (CAW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott G. Mitchell
Represented By: Roger W. Plata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?