Dolen v. Ryals et al

Plaintiff: Deborah R. Dolen
Defendant: Julie Ryals, Jane Doe Libel Cyberstalker, Mary Joanne Kidd, Jeffery A. Kidd, Mary Harvey and Cornell Road
Counter Claimant: Julie Ryals, Mary Joanne Kidd, Jeffery A. Kidd and Mary Harvey
Counter Defendant: Deborah R. Dolen
Case Number: 8:2009cv02120
Filed: October 22, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Tampa Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Steven D. Merryday
Presiding Judge: Anthony E. Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER granting 95 --motion for judgment on the pleadings; denying 96 --motion to strike all counterclaims; striking 108 --amended complaint; granting 97 --motion to dismiss; dismissing 94 --dropped defendants' answer and counterclaims; dismissing from this action with prejudice Mary Harvey, Jeffrey A. Kidd, and Mary Joanne Kidd; denying 103 --motion for leave to file a third amended complaint; denying 112 --amended motion for preliminary injunction; denying without prejudice 116 --motion in limine; denying 119 --motion to compel mental exmination of the plaintiff; denying 126 --motion for sanctions; denying as moot 132 --plaintiff's motion to strike. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 2/24/2011. (BK)
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER striking 89 --answer/counterclaims; denying as moot 90 --motion to dismiss counterclaim; denying plaintiff's request for a hearing; directing the defendnat to answer the complaint by 8/6/2010. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 7/29/2010. (BK)
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting 76 --motion for leave to file an amended complaint; amended complaint due 6/18/2010; denying as moot 82 --motion to strike; denying 83 --motion for preliminary injunction; denying without prejudice 83 --motion seeking to enjoin the defendants' infringing a trademark. Plaintiff's single interrogatory to the defendants shall be served by 5/28/2010. Defendants' shall respond to the interrogatory by 6/4/2010. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 5/24/2010. (BK)
April 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER denying 59 , 60 --motions for summary judgment; denying 63 , 64 --motion for default judgment; denying as moot 67 --motion to strike; ORDER directing the plaintiff TO SHOW CAUSE by 5/7/2010 why the Clerk should not default the plaintiff for failing to answer or otherwise respond to the counterclaims, failing which an order of default will enter without further notice. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 4/23/2010. (BK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dolen v. Ryals et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah R. Dolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Ryals
Represented By: Kent A. Rowald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Libel Cyberstalker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Joanne Kidd
Represented By: Kent A. Rowald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery A. Kidd
Represented By: Kent A. Rowald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Harvey
Represented By: Kent A. Rowald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornell Road
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Julie Ryals
Represented By: Kent A. Rowald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Mary Joanne Kidd
Represented By: Kent A. Rowald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Jeffery A. Kidd
Represented By: Kent A. Rowald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Mary Harvey
Represented By: Kent A. Rowald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Deborah R. Dolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?