Thompkins v. Gulf Beaches Public Library, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Harriet Thompkins
Defendant: Gulf Beaches Public Library, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2010cv01518
Filed: July 9, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Tampa Office
County: Pinellas
Presiding Judge: Thomas B. McCoun
Presiding Judge: Steven D. Merryday
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2010 Filing 17 NOTICE of withdrawal of motion by Gulf Beaches Public Library, Inc. to Strike Punitive Damages (Salzman, Andrew)
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER directing the defendant to file by 11/24/2010 a memorandum re punitive damages; permitting a response of no more than ten pages by 12/3/2010. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 11/18/2010. (BK)
November 18, 2010 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in opposition re 14 Motion to strike Punitive Damages filed by Harriet Thompkins. (Berman, Craig)
November 9, 2010 Filing 14 MOTION to strike Punitive Damages Claim by Gulf Beaches Public Library, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A")(Salzman, Andrew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
October 12, 2010 Filing 13 NOTICE of mediation hearing to be held on February 16, 2011 at 1:30 p.m. before Mary Lau, Esq.. (Berman, Craig)
October 5, 2010 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Harriet Thompkins identifying Corporate Parent Gulf Beaches Public Library, Inc. for Harriet Thompkins.. (Berman, Craig)
October 5, 2010 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Harriet Thompkins. Related case(s): no (Berman, Craig)
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE to mediation before Mary A. Lau. Lead counsel Craig Berman to coordinate dates and file notice of mediation within 20 days. Mediation shall be conducted on or before May 6, 2011. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 9/23/2010. (TKD)
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 11/15/2010, Discovery due by 7/1/2011, Dispositive motions due by 8/1/2011, Pretrial Conference set for 9/1/2011 at 10:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 12 B before Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III, Jury Trial set for the October, 2011 trial term in Tampa Courtroom 15 A before Judge Steven D. Merryday. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 9/20/2010. (TKD)
September 13, 2010 Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Salzman, Andrew)
August 17, 2010 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Caitlin E. Sirico on behalf of Gulf Beaches Public Library, Inc. (Sirico, Caitlin)
August 5, 2010 Filing 6 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Gulf Beaches Public Library, Inc..(Salzman, Andrew)
August 5, 2010 Filing 5 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Gulf Beaches Public Library, Inc..(Salzman, Andrew) Modified on 8/5/2010 (MRH). NOTE: TERMINATED. INCORRECT ATTACHMENTS. ATTORNEY NOTIFIED. ATTORNEY TO REFILE.
August 5, 2010 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew James Salzman on behalf of Gulf Beaches Public Library, Inc. (Salzman, Andrew)
July 20, 2010 Filing 3 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2 (TKD)
July 9, 2010 Filing 2 Summons issued as to Gulf Beaches Public Library, Inc., c/o Margaret Cinnella. (MRH)
July 9, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gulf Beaches Public Library, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number T056169) filed by Harriet Thompkins. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MRH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompkins v. Gulf Beaches Public Library, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harriet Thompkins
Represented By: Craig L. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf Beaches Public Library, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?