DISH Network L.L.C. et al v. I.E. Entertainment, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: NagraStar LLC, DISH Network L.L.C. and EchoStar Technologies L.L.C.
Defendant: I.E. Entertainment, Inc., Ian Jones and Eric Johnson
Case Number: 8:2011cv00308
Filed: February 15, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Tampa Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A. Jenkins
Presiding Judge: James S. Moody
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 0605
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 101 FINAL JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 2/14/2012. (LN)
April 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION: Order granting 68 Motion for preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 4/12/2011. (LN)
April 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER dismissing Defendant LARRY HYMAN Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 4/11/2011. (LN)
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Plaintiffs'Motion for Temporary Restraining Order 2 is DENIED. This case is set for a hearing on Plaintiffs' request for a preliminary injunction before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Jenkins on WEDNESDAY, MARCH 2, 2011, at 9:00 a.m. Service of all filings shall be effectuated upon Defendants by Monday, February 21, 2011. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 2/15/2011. (LN)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DISH Network L.L.C. et al v. I.E. Entertainment, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I.E. Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Byrley Colgan
Represented By: Edwin G. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Johnson
Represented By: Kenneth Dane Morse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NagraStar LLC
Represented By: James A. Boatman, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph H. Boyle
Represented By: Christopher P. Craven
Represented By: Chad M. Hagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DISH Network L.L.C.
Represented By: Chad M. Hagan
Represented By: Stephen M. Ferguson
Represented By: Christopher P. Craven
Represented By: Joseph H. Boyle
Represented By: James A. Boatman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EchoStar Technologies L.L.C.
Represented By: James A. Boatman, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph H. Boyle
Represented By: Christopher P. Craven
Represented By: Chad M. Hagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?