Slep-Tone Entertainment Corporation v. Butler et al
Plaintiff: Slep-Tone Entertainment Corporation
Defendant: Jason Butler, Big Dog Karaoke, Katherine L. Simmons, Wilfred J. Simmons, Gary J. Sonnay, Dale Dunn, Dunn Deal Entertainment and Joseph A. Dunn
Case Number: 8:2011cv01552
Filed: July 13, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Tampa Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Anthony E. Porcelli
Presiding Judge: James S. Moody
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER dismissing case without prejudice. All pending motions are denied as moot. Clerk shall close the file. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 2/11/2013. (LN)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER: Defendant Jason Butler's Amended Motion to Set Aside Default Final Judgment and Permanent Injunction and for Oral Argument 93 is GRANTED. Butler shall electronically file his answer to the complaint as a separate document on CM/ECF (i ncluded in his motion at pages 13-15) by this Friday, March 16, 2012. The Default Final Judgment and Permanent Injunction entered on February 16, 2012 90 is set aside solely as to Defendant Jason Butler. The CLERK shall reinstate Defendant Jason Butler as a party-Defendant in this case. Butler's counsel Corey D. Linick shall contact the CLERK's office and confirm that he is registered on CM/ECF and will receive electronic notice of all future filings in this case as long as he remains counsel of record. Mr. Linick should also verify with his e-mail provider that the CM/ECF notices are not getting diverted to his e-mail spam folder. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 3/14/2012. (LN)
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 90 DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION: Order granting in part 89 Motion for Default Judgment against Defendants JASON BUTLER, DALE DUNN, JOSEPH A. DUNN, DUNN DEAL ENTERTAINMENT and GARY J. SONNAY. (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 2/16/2012. (LN)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slep-Tone Entertainment Corporation v. Butler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Slep-Tone Entertainment Corporation
Represented By: William L. Yanger
Represented By: James Michael Harrington
Represented By: Maria Del Pilar Floren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Butler
Represented By: Corey David Linick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Dog Karaoke
Represented By: Martin Bruce Sipple
Represented By: Ruth E. Vafek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine L. Simmons
Represented By: Martin Bruce Sipple
Represented By: Ruth E. Vafek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilfred J. Simmons
Represented By: Martin Bruce Sipple
Represented By: Ruth E. Vafek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary J. Sonnay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dunn Deal Entertainment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph A. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?