Shire Development, LLC et al v. Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Shire Development, LLC, Shire Pharmaceutical Development, Inc., Cosmo Technologies Limited and Giuliani International Limited
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Mylan, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2012cv01190
Filed: May 25, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Tampa Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Anthony E. Porcelli
Presiding Judge: James S. Moody
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 558 ORDER adopting 557 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge. The Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is adopted, as set forth in this Order, to the extent that it recommends the denial of Defendants' Motion for Taxation of Costs, for all purposes including appellate review. Defendants' Motion for Taxation of Costs 552 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 12/3/2018. (BGS)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 503 OPINION AND ORDER. 1. A judgment declaring that the submission and filing of Mylan's ANDA with a paragraph IV certification was an act of infringement of the '720 Patent by Mylan. 2. A judgment declaring that the commercial manufa cture, use, sale, offer for sale and/or importation into the United States of Mylan's Product prior to the expiration of the '720 Patent will constitute an act of infringement of the '720 Patent by Mylan. 3. A judgment declaring that Mylan Inc. has, is, and will induce and/or contribute to Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s infringement of the '720 Patent. 4. An order that the effective date of any approval of Mylan's ANDA shall be no earlier than the expiration date of the '720 Patent. 5. A judgment permanently enjoining Mylan from engaging in the commercial manufacture, use, sale, offer for sale and/or importation in the United States of Mylan's Product until the expiration of the '720 Patent. 6. A judgment declaring that Mylan's claims of invalidity are dismissed with prejudice. For the foregoing reasons, Mylan's Motion for Judgment on Partial Findings 478 is DENIED. A Final Judgment in favor of Shire will issue by separate Order. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 1/27/2017. (BGS)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER on 175 178 Claim Construction. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 3/23/2015. (AHH)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' Expedited Motion for Supplemental Briefing and Adjournment of Expert Discovery Deadlines 221 , 224 . Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 2/24/2015. (AHH)
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings (Dkt. 83) is DENIED. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 3/21/2014. (LN)
December 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER denying in part 48 Motion to Compel regarding production of unredacted deposition transcripts and expert materials with respect to the Zydus Parties and the Osmotica Parties; granting 59 Motion to Intervene and Motion for Protective Order; granting 58 construed Motion to Intervene and Motion for Protective Order. A hearing is scheduled for January 10, 2014, at 2 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli in Tampa Courtroom 10A. Please see Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 12/30/2013. (DNE)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shire Development, LLC et al v. Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shire Development, LLC
Represented By: Mahlon H. Barlow
Represented By: Elizabeth Murphy
Represented By: Mark P. Walters
Represented By: Andrew Wasson
Represented By: Paul David Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shire Pharmaceutical Development, Inc.
Represented By: Mahlon H. Barlow
Represented By: Elizabeth Murphy
Represented By: Mark P. Walters
Represented By: Andrew Wasson
Represented By: Paul David Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cosmo Technologies Limited
Represented By: Mahlon H. Barlow
Represented By: Elizabeth Murphy
Represented By: Mark P. Walters
Represented By: Andrew Wasson
Represented By: Paul David Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giuliani International Limited
Represented By: Mahlon H. Barlow
Represented By: Elizabeth Murphy
Represented By: Mark P. Walters
Represented By: Andrew Wasson
Represented By: Paul David Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?