Kuhlman v. Louisville Ladder, Inc.
Plaintiff: Randall Kuhlman and Ann Kuhlman
Defendant: Louisville Ladder, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2012cv01238
Filed: June 1, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Tampa Office
County: Hillsborough
Presiding Judge: Virginia M. Hernandez Covington
Presiding Judge: Anthony E. Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 137 JUDGMENT in favor of Louisville Ladder, Inc. against Ann Kuhlman, Randall Kuhlman Signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/8/2014. (JNB)
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER of recusal. Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Jenkins for all further proceedings. New case number: 8:12-cv-1238-T-33EAJ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 9/24/2013. (JNB)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Defendant Louisville Ladder, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Counts III, IV and V of Plaintiffs' Complaint 4 is GRANTED without prejudice and with leave to amend. Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint on or before December 14, 2012. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/30/2012. (MEB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kuhlman v. Louisville Ladder, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Kuhlman
Represented By: Brent Lee Probinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Kuhlman
Represented By: Brent Lee Probinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisville Ladder, Inc.
Represented By: Robert M. Fulton
Represented By: Sherilee J. Samuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?