Health & Sun Research, Inc. et al v. Designer Skin LLC
Plaintiff: Health & Sun Research, Inc.
Defendant: Designer Skin LLC
Case Number: 8:2012cv02319
Filed: October 11, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Tampa Office
County: Pinellas
Presiding Judge: Virginia M. Hernandez Covington
Presiding Judge: Mark A. Pizzo
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:0044 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER: Health & Sun's Motion for Permanent Injunction 144 is GRANTED as specified herein. Health & Sun's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Enhanced Damages 145 is DENIED as to attorneys' fees, DENIED as to enhanced damages, and DENIED AS MOOT as to prejudgment interest. As to disgorgement, the Court directs Australian Gold to file a report of its post-verdict sales of PURPLE REIGN on or before June 27, 2014, as specified above. The parties have ten days from the filing of t hat report to file separate submissions regarding disgorgement or a joint resolution of the matter. The Court will issue a separate order after it receives this information from the parties. Australian Gold's Rule 59(e) Motion to Equitably Reduce Damages 146 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 6/19/2014. (KAK)
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER denying 89 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying 91 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying 96 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying 97 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying 99 Motion for Jud gment as a Matter of Law; denying 101 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying 103 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying 107 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying 118 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; deny ing 119 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying 135 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. The Clerk is directed to enter Judgment in accordance with the jury's verdict and to CLOSE THE CASE. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 3/13/2014. (KAK)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER denying 67 Motion for Reconsideration. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/19/2013. (KAK)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 47 Motion in Limine. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/25/2013. (KAK)
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER: Defendant Australian Gold, LLC's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Gary L. Raines (Doc. # 44) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/19/2013. (KAK)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER denying Australian Gold, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/14/2013. (KAK)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Health & Sun Research, Inc. et al v. Designer Skin LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Health & Sun Research, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Robert Pellenbarg
Represented By: Harvey S. Kauget
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Designer Skin LLC
Represented By: James B. Lake
Represented By: James J. McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?