Hayas v. Geico General Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Kenneth E. Hayas
Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company
Case Number: 8:2013cv01432
Filed: May 31, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Tampa Office
County: Polk
Presiding Judge: Virginia M. Hernandez Covington
Presiding Judge: Anthony E. Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER: Defendant GEICO General Insurance Company's Motion for Taxation of Costs and Proposed Bill of Costs [118, 119] are DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/4/2015. (AKH)
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER: GEICO General Insurance Company's Motion for Summary Judgment 68 is GRANTED. Kenneth Hayas' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 72 is DENIED. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of GEICO General Insurance Company and against Kenneth E. Hayas. After judgment is entered, the Clerk is thereafter directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/5/2014. (AKH)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER: Plaintiff Kenneth E. Hayas' Motion in Limine 80 is DENIED. Defendant GEICO General Insurance Company's Motions in Limine 84 are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as detailed herein. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/3/2014. (AKH)
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER: GEICO General Insurance Company's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Supplemental Expert Disclosure 78 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 10/22/2014. (AKH)
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 38 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 10/21/2014. (FDM)
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying 7 motion to dismiss. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/21/2013. (KAK)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hayas v. Geico General Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth E. Hayas
Represented By: Ronald Irwin Croft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?