Apple Glen Investors, L.P. v. Express Scripts, Inc.
Plaintiff: Apple Glen Investors, L.P.
Defendant: Express Scripts, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2014cv01527
Filed: June 25, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Tampa Office
County: Hillsborough
Presiding Judge: Virginia M. Hernandez Covington
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A. Jenkins
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER: The Report and Recommendation (Doc. # 147 ) is ACCEPTED and ADOPTED. Plaintiff's Corrected Amended Final Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Prejudgment Interest (Doc. # 135 ) is GRANTED to the extent that Plaintiff is awarded $921,501.00 in attorneys' fees, $39,783.12 in costs, and prejudgment interest accruing at a rate of 18 percent as specified in the Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 6/11/2018. (KAK)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER: Appellee Apple Glen Investors, L.P.'s Corrected Amended Final Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs and Prejudgment Interest (Doc. # 135 ) is hereby referred to the Honorable Thomas G. Wilson, United States Magistrate Judge, for the issuance of a report and recommendation, including any hearings, motions, and deadlines related thereto. Apple Glen's prior applications for fees and costs (Doc. ## 118 , 131 , 134 ) are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/19/2017. (KAK)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER: Defendant Express Scripts, Inc.'s Motion to Approve Supersedeas Bond and Stay Enforcement of Amended Judgment (Doc. # 111 ) is GRANTED. The Court hereby stays any proceedings to enforce the Amended Judgment pending disposition of Expr ess Scripts' appeal, including to the United States Supreme Court, if applicable. The Court authorizes Express Scripts to file a supersedeas bond with the Clerk of the Court in the amount of $6,388,534.28, and finds that the posting of the bond provides adequate security to Apple Glen for its interest in the Amended Judgment during the pendency of any appeals. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 10/31/2016. (KAK)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER: Plaintiff Apple Glen Investors, L.P.'s Renewed Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs (Doc. # 106 ) is DENIED without prejudice and with leave to re-file no later than fourteen days after entry of a mandate by the Court of Appeals on the pending appeal. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 10/7/2016. (KAK)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER: Plaintiff Apple Glen Investors, L.P.'s Renewed Motion to Determine Amount of Prejudgment Interest and for Entry of Final Judgment (Doc. # 100 ) is GRANTED as provided. The Clerk is directed to enter an amended judgment in favor of Pl aintiff Apple Glen Investors, L.P. in a sum of $6,284,465.25 (representing $4,654,688.65 in damages and $1,629,776.60 in prejudgment interest), which shall accrue postjudgment interest at the federal statutory rate as prescribed by 28 U.S.C. § 1961, for which sum let execution issue. This case was previously closed, and it shall remain so. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 9/8/2016. (DRW)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER: Defendant Express Scripts, Inc.'s Motion to Approve Supersedeas Bond and Stay Enforcement of Judgment (Doc. # 93 ) is GRANTED. The Court hereby stays any proceedings to enforce the Judgment (Doc. # 87 ), pending disposition of Expre ss Scripts' appeal, including to the United States Supreme Court, if applicable. The Court authorizes Express Scripts to file a supersedeas bond with the Clerk of the Court in the amount of $6,370,019.80, and finds that the posting of the bond provides adequate security to Apple Glen for its interest in the Judgment during the pendency of any appeals. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 4/22/2016. (KAK)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER: Plaintiff Apple Glen Investors, L.P.'s Motion to Determine Amount of Prejudgment Interest and to Direct Entry of Amended Final Judgment (Doc. # 90 ) and Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs (Doc. # 91 ) are DENIED without prejudice and with leave to re-file no later than fourteen days after entry of a mandate by the Court of Appeals on the pending appeal. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 4/15/2016. (KAK)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 FINDINGS of fact and conclusions of law. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of Apple Glen Investors, LP, in a sum of $4,654,688.65, plus prejudgment interest accruing from April 1, 2014, and thereafter CLOSE this case. Apple G len has thirty days from the date of this Order to file any motions for attorneys' fees, costs, and prejudgment interest. Case closure by the Clerk will not prevent the Court from ruling on any timely filed requests for attorneys' fees, costs, and prejudgment interest sought herein. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 3/10/2016. (KAK)
July 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER denying 42 Motion for Summary Judgment. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 7/27/2015. (KAK)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER: Defendant Express Scripts, Inc.'s Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Gary Keene 39 and Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Brad Johnson 40 are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 6/15/2015. (KAK)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Apple Glen Investors, L.P. v. Express Scripts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apple Glen Investors, L.P.
Represented By: Timothy D. Woodward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts, Inc.
Represented By: Robert L. Rocke
Represented By: Jonathan B. Sbar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?