K&N Trucking, Inc. v. Foundation Xpress, LLC

Plaintiff: K&N Trucking, Inc.
Defendant: Foundation Xpress, LLC
Counter_claimant: Foundation Xpress, LLC
Counter_defendant: K&N Trucking, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2016cv03087
Filed: November 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Tampa Office
County: Hillsborough
Presiding Judge: Susan C Bucklew
Presiding Judge: Anthony E. Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Commercial/ICC Rates/etc.
Cause of Action: 49:11702
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting 46 Motion for Attorney Fees. The Clerk is directed to enter an amended judgment. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 2/28/2018. (JD)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting 38 Motion for Default Judgment. The Clerk is directed to enter default judgment in favor of Plaintiff in the total amount of $61,237.41 for Counts I, II, and II. The Clerk is directed to close this case. The Court retains jurisdiction to determine the issues of attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 2/9/2018. (JD)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying 19 Motion for Enforcement of Settlement Agreement and Order of Entitlement to Attorneys' Fees as Prevailing Party. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 10/4/2017. (GAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: K&N Trucking, Inc. v. Foundation Xpress, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K&N Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: Brian K. Mathis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foundation Xpress, LLC
Represented By: Daniel John Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Foundation Xpress, LLC
Represented By: Daniel John Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: K&N Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: Brian K. Mathis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?