Reed v. U.S. Bank National Association et al
Plaintiff: Patricia Reed
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registrations Systems, Inc., America Brokers Conduit and Does
Case Number: 8:2017cv01051
Filed: May 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Tampa Office
County: Sarasota
Presiding Judge: Virginia M. Hernandez Covington
Presiding Judge: Anthony E. Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: The Amended Complaint (Doc. # 18 ) is DISMISSED with leave to amend by August 17, 2017. If Reed fails to file a second amended complaint by that date, the case will be dismissed without further notice. Additionally, the Court extends the service deadline to September 5, 2017, so that Reed will have sufficient time to serve the second amended complaint. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 7/17/2017. (DMD)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Plaintiff Patricia Reed's Complaint (Doc. # 1 ) is DISMISSED. Reed may file an amended complaint by June 8, 2017. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this action without further notice. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 5/11/2017. (DMD)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Pro se Plaintiff Patricia Reed's Emergency Motion for a TRO or Injunction to Stop Eviction (Doc. # 9 ) is DENIED insofar as it seeks a temporary restraining order. To the extent the Motion requests a preliminary injunction, it is referred to the Honorable Anthony E. Porcelli, United States Magistrate Judge, for a report and recommendation. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 5/10/2017. (DMD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed v. U.S. Bank National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registrations Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: America Brokers Conduit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?