United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Favorite Farms, Inc.
Plaintiff: United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Favorite Farms, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2017cv01292
Filed: May 31, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Tampa Office
County: Hillsborough
Presiding Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Presiding Judge: James S. Moody
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER denying 75 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 87 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 88 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 103 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 10/1/2018. (JG)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER denying 60 motion to keep briefing and orders under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 8/6/2018. (DMP) UNSEALED PER CHAMBERS on 8/6/2018 (LSS).
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 45 motion to seal. Due to time constraints and the fact paper documents are necessary for filing under seal, all responses to Favorite Farms' 41 motion to compel must be submitted in paper format to the Clerk's office by 4:00 p.m. on May 14, 2018. No extensions of time will be given. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 5/9/2018. (DMP) Modified on 5/9/2018 (DMP).
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER denying 28 motion to dismiss: Counts V and VI of Intervenor-Plaintiff's Amended Complaint are not dismissed. Count VIII of the Intervenor-Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its and her own costs and fees, pursuant to the parties' Joint Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal 34 . Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 1/4/2018. (JG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Favorite Farms, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Oshia Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Favorite Farms, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?