Bruce et al v. U.S. Bank National Association et al
Plaintiff: Roy W. Bruce and Alice Bruce
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association and Albertelli Law
Case Number: 8:2017cv02023
Filed: August 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Tampa Office
County: Hillsborough
Presiding Judge: Virginia M. Hernandez Covington
Presiding Judge: Julie S. Sneed
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1640
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER: Plaintiffs Roy Bruce and Alice Bruce's Motion for Reconsideration of Order Dismissing Case (Doc. # 33 ) is DENIED.Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 2/6/2018. (KAK)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: Defendants U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee Successor in Interest to Bank of America, National Association, as Trustee, Successor by Merger to Lasalle Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Structured Asset Securities Corporation Mortgage P ass-through and Albertelli Laws' Motions to Dismiss the Verified Complaint (Doc. ## 8 , 27 ) are GRANTED. Count Two of the Complaint, for violations of the FDCPA is dismissed as time barred. The Court declines to exercise jurisdiction over the remaining state law claims and those claims are dismissed without prejudice. See 28 U.S.C. § 1367(c)(3).The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/15/2017. (KAK)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying without prejudice 21 Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Clerk's Default. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on 11/9/2017. (SMC)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying without prejudice 19 Plaintiffs' Motion for Clerk's Default. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on 11/6/2017. (SMC)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Defendant U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee Successor in Interest to Bank of America, National Association, as Trustee, Successor by Merger to Lasalle Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Structured Asset Securities Corporation Mortgage Pa ss-Through's Motion to Dismiss Complaint (Doc. # 8 ) is GRANTED as an unopposed motion. Defendant U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee Successor in Interest to Bank of America, National Association, as Trustee, Successor by Merger to Lasalle Bank, Nati onal Association, as Trustee for Structured Asset Securities Corporation Mortgage Pass-Through is dismissed from this lawsuit. Plaintiffs are directed to file a status report by October 31, 2017, describing the efforts Plaintiffs have undertaken to serve Albertelli Law with the Summons and Complaint. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 10/17/2017. (KAK)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bruce et al v. U.S. Bank National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy W. Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albertelli Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?