United States of America v. Jones et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Daphne D. Jones, On Point Group Inc., Hillsborough County Code Enforcement, R. Dennis Langston, Florida Department of Revenue, Stay Dry Roofing of Tampa Bay, Bay Gulf Credit Union, CitiFinancial Services, Inc., Tampa Bay Black Business Investment Corp. and John A. Rhoades, Jr.
Case Number: 8:2017cv02389
Filed: October 12, 2017
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Tampa Office
County: Hillsborough
Presiding Judge: Susan C Bucklew
Referring Judge: Anthony E. Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 26:7403
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 22, 2018 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 50 Motion to Vacate default judgment. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 6/22/2018. (JD)
May 8, 2018 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 46 Motion for Default Judgment. See order for details. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 5/8/2018. (JD)
January 11, 2018 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 26 Motion for Entry of Default. The motion is GRANTED as to Defendants R. Dennis Langston, Stay Dry Roofing of Tampa Bay, and Bay Gulf Credit Union, and the Clerk is directed to enter default against them.The motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendant Florida Department of Revenue and Defendant CitiFinancial Services, Inc. Plaintiff is directed to show proper service on these two defendants by February 9, 2018. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 1/11/2018. (JD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kari A.R. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daphne D. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: On Point Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillsborough County Code Enforcement
Represented By: Kenneth Cardell Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Dennis Langston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Department of Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stay Dry Roofing of Tampa Bay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bay Gulf Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiFinancial Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tampa Bay Black Business Investment Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A. Rhoades, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?