Gomez et al v. City of Tampa

Plaintiff: Francisco M. Gomez and Carmen Gomez
Defendant: City of Tampa
Case Number: 8:2018cv01690
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Tampa Office
County: Hillsborough
0 Judge: Steven D Merryday
1 Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #13 Plaintiffs' Amended Motion to Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 8/23/2018. (AHA)
August 22, 2018 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Helinger, James)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #12 Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. The Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint within five (5) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 8/21/2018. (AHA)
August 16, 2018 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 Amended MOTION to remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by City of Tampa. (Horton Silverman, Robin)
August 16, 2018 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 Amended MOTION for leave to file Amended Complaint filed by City of Tampa. (Horton Silverman, Robin)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER approving consent to jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 8/8/2018. (BK)
August 7, 2018 Filing 14 CONSENT to trial by U.S. Magistrate Judge by City of Tampa. (Horton Silverman, Robin)
August 2, 2018 Filing 13 Amended MOTION to remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by All Plaintiffs. (DeYoung, Donald)
August 2, 2018 Filing 12 Amended MOTION for leave to file Amended Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(DeYoung, Donald)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #9 --motion for leave to amend; denying #10 --motion to remand. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 8/2/2018. (BK)
July 30, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by All Plaintiffs. (DeYoung, Donald)
July 30, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to file Amended Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(DeYoung, Donald)
July 30, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Carmen Gomez, Francisco M. Gomez. Related case(s): No (DeYoung, Donald)
July 27, 2018 Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Horton Silverman, Robin)
July 27, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by City of Tampa. Related case(s): No (Horton Silverman, Robin)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #4 --notice of designation of track. See document for details. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 7/16/2018. (GSO)
July 16, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. (GSO)
July 13, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #2 Complaint filed in state court on 7/9/2018 by City of Tampa.(DG)
July 13, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against City of Tampa with Jury Demand filed in state court on 6/13/2018 by Francisco M. Gomez, Carmen Gomez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(DG)
July 13, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Thirteenth Judicial Circuit, Hillsborough County, case number 18-CA-005665 Div. D filed in State Court on 6/13/2018. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number TPA-51772 filed by City of Tampa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Summons, #2 Exhibit Request for Division Assignment, #3 Exhibit Efiled Summons Issued, #4 Exhibit Notice of Filing Ver. Return, #5 Exhibit Verified Return of Service, #6 Exhibit Notice of Appearance, #7 Exhibit Notice of Nonavailability, #8 Exhibit Notice of Service of First Set of Interrogatories, #9 Exhibit First Request for Production, #10 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #11 Exhibit Notice to Adverse Parties, #12 Civil Cover Sheet State Court, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(DG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gomez et al v. City of Tampa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco M. Gomez
Represented By: Donald Tobyn DeYoung
Represented By: James A. Helinger, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Gomez
Represented By: Donald Tobyn DeYoung
Represented By: James A. Helinger, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Tampa
Represented By: Robin Horton Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?