Brown et al v. Omni Management Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Stephanie Forrester and Kelly Brown
Defendant: Omni Management Group, LLC, Deslyn Patram Flynn, All Seasons Travel and Resort Inc. and Lawrence Flynn
Case Number: 8:2018cv01772
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Tampa Office
County: Hillsborough
Presiding Judge: Mary S Scriven
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2018 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by All Seasons Travel and Resort Inc., Lawrence Flynn, Omni Management Group, LLC. (Hearing, Gregory)
September 7, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by All Seasons Travel and Resort Inc., Lawrence Flynn, Omni Management Group, LLC. Related case(s): no (Hearing, Gregory)
September 4, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #8 Amended Complaint by All Seasons Travel and Resort Inc., Lawrence Flynn, Omni Management Group, LLC.(Hearing, Gregory)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #11 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Amended Complaint. Defendants shall have up to and including September 4, 2018 to file their answers or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/21/2018. (APF)
August 20, 2018 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #8 Amended Complaint by All Seasons Travel and Resort Inc., Deslyn Patram Flynn, Lawrence Flynn, Omni Management Group, LLC. (Hearing, Gregory)
August 6, 2018 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Kelly Brown, Stephanie Forrester. (Feldman, Mitchell)
August 6, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Kelly Brown, Stephanie Forrester. Related case(s): no (Feldman, Mitchell)
August 6, 2018 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by Kelly Brown, Stephanie Forrester.(Feldman, Mitchell)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/6/2018. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 7/23/2018. (KTT)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/6/2018. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 7/23/2018. (KTT)
July 19, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Deslyn Patram Flynn. (LNR)
July 19, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Lawrence Flynn. (LNR)
July 19, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to All Seasons Travel and Resort Inc. (LNR)
July 19, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to Omni Management Group, LLC. (LNR)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Seasons Travel and Resort Inc., Lawrence Flynn, Deslyn Patram Flynn, Omni Management Group, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number TPA51968) filed by Kelly Brown, Stephanie Forrester. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LNR) Modified text on 7/20/2018 (LNR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown et al v. Omni Management Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Forrester
Represented By: Mitchell L. Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Brown
Represented By: Mitchell L. Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omni Management Group, LLC
Represented By: Gregory Alan Hearing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deslyn Patram Flynn
Represented By: Gregory Alan Hearing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Seasons Travel and Resort Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Alan Hearing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Flynn
Represented By: Gregory Alan Hearing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?