Bowman v. Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Karen Bowman
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, James E. Albertelli, PA and Albertelli Law Partners Virgin Islands, PLLC
Case Number: 8:2018cv01874
Filed: July 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Tampa Office
County: Hillsborough
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Kovachevich
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ENDORSED ORDER granting #27 motion to appear telephonically. Under the court's previous 25 Endorsed Order, all parties may appear at the Case Management Conference telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 9/11/2018. (DMP)
September 11, 2018 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Telephonically by Albertelli Law Partners Virgin Islands, PLLC, James E. Albertelli, PA. (Vesely, Brandon) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
September 7, 2018 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Apatov, Joseph)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ENDORSED ORDER granting #24 motion to conduct case management conference by telephone. Both parties may appear telephonically at the case management conference for the purpose of filing their joint Case Management Report. If the parties fail to agree on necessary terms of the Case Management Report, the court may require the parties to conduct a second case management conference in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 9/6/2018. (DMP)
September 5, 2018 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Telephonically to Conduct Case Management Conference by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Apatov, Joseph) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ENDORSED ORDER granting #22 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 9/5/2018. (RLH)
September 4, 2018 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Apatov, Joseph)
August 30, 2018 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #15 Motion to dismiss filed by Karen Bowman. (Fowler, Nick)
August 30, 2018 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Karen Bowman. (Fowler, Nick)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #18 motion to dismiss for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(c). The Court construes Defendant's amended motion as a "further memorandum" directed at its motion to dismiss, and Defendant must therefore seek leave to file. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 8/30/2018. (RLH)
August 29, 2018 Filing 18 Amended MOTION to Dismiss by Albertelli Law Partners Virgin Islands, PLLC, James E. Albertelli, PA. (Vesely, Brandon)
August 29, 2018 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #11 Motion to dismiss filed by Karen Bowman. (Fowler, Nick)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying #13 motion for entry of clerk's default. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 8/28/2018. (DMP)
August 28, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Albertelli Law Partners Virgin Islands, PLLC, James E. Albertelli, PA. (Vesely, Brandon)
August 28, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon S. Vesely on behalf of Albertelli Law Partners Virgin Islands, PLLC, James E. Albertelli, PA (Vesely, Brandon)
August 28, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Albertelli Law Partners Virgin Islands, PLLC, James E. Albertelli, PA by Karen Bowman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavits of Service)(Fowler, Nick) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
August 23, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Specialized Loan Servicing Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Computershare Limited for Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC.. (Apatov, Joseph)
August 23, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Foreclosure Complaint with Note and Mortgage)(Apatov, Joseph)
August 21, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Andrew Apatov on behalf of Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC (Apatov, Joseph)
August 21, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Mark New, II on behalf of Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC (New, Nicholas)
August 8, 2018 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 8/6/18 by Karen Bowman as to James E. Albertelli, PA. (Fowler, Nick)
August 8, 2018 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 8/6/18 by Karen Bowman as to Albertelli Law Partners Virgin Islands, PLLC. (Fowler, Nick)
August 8, 2018 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on 8/6/18 by Karen Bowman as to Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Fowler, Nick)
August 1, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 issued by Deputy Clerk on 8/1/2018. (SRC)
July 31, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Albertelli Law Partners Virgin Islands, PLLC. (DG)
July 31, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to James E. Albertelli, PA. (DG)
July 31, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (DG)
July 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Albertelli Law Partners Virgin Islands, PLLC, James E. Albertelli, PA, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number TPA-052168) filed by Karen Bowman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(DG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowman v. Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas Mark New, II
Represented By: Joseph Andrew Apatov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Albertelli, PA
Represented By: Brandon S. Vesely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albertelli Law Partners Virgin Islands, PLLC
Represented By: Brandon S. Vesely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Bowman
Represented By: Nick Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?